This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:21:22 (UTC).

Jones v. The Kroger Company

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Jones filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against The Kroger Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Jones

Defendant

The Kroger Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terence Richard Coates

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco, LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider, LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Dylan James Gould

Attorney at Markovits Stock & DeMarco

3825 Edwards Rd., Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Zachary C Schaengold

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Wilbert Benjamin Markovits

Attorney at Markovits, Stock & DeMarco LLC

3825 Edwards Road, Suite 650

Cincinnati, OH 45209

Defendant Attorneys

Nathaniel Lampley, Jr

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease - 1

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500, Great American Tower

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Colleen Theresa Brown

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1501 K Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Eamon P. Joyce

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#6

#8

#11

#12

#15

#16

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint New date requested 6/21/2021. by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The Kroger Company on 3/5/2021, answer due 5/4/2021. (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that case numbers 1:21-cv-279, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 and 1:21-cv-240 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (kh) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiff James Jones. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that the cases and case numbers 1:21-cv-240, 1:21-cv-146, 1:21-cv-174, 1:21-cv-198, 1:21-cv-226 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/19/2021. (kh) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:21-cv-226 ARE related. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/15/2021. (kl) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black and Judge Douglas R. Cole on 3/31/2021. The Judges agree that Case 1:21cv198 IS related to Cases 1:21cv146 and 1:21cv174. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Colleen T. Brown; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eamon P. Joyce as Co-Counsel. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/18/2021. (eh) Modified on 3/18/2021 (kl). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by Judge Timothy S. Black and Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 3/17/2021. The Judges agree that Case numbers 1:21cv146 and 1:21cv174 ARE related. Case 1:21cv174 reassigned to Judge Timothy S. Black for all further proceedings. (eh) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8220396) of Eamon P. Joyce by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8220360) of Colleen T. Brown by Defendant The Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Lampley, Jr for Defendant The Kroger Company (Lampley, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against The Kroger Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8193062), filed by James Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coates, Terence) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eamon Paul Joyce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaniel Lampley, Jr.