This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:39:14 (UTC).

Jones v. The Kroger Co. et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Betty Jones

Defendants

The Kroger Co.

Vets Securing America, Inc.

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Cordele Rolle

Attorney at The Cordele Firm, Inc.

5815 Live Oak Pkwy, Suite A

Norcross, GA 30093

Defendant Attorneys

Gailya McElroy Scott

Attorney at Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett Brieske, LLP

950 East Paces Ferry Road Ne, Suite 1700- Salesforce Tower Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30326

Matthew G. Moffett

Attorney at Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 1700 - Salesforce Tower Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30326

Thomas Ryan Mock, Jr.

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

303 Peachtree St, Ste 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Lauren E. H. Meadows

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Stephen Michael Schatz

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE by The Kroger Co. (Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff) (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE by The Kroger Co. of Deposition of Plaintiff (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Certificate of Service (Amended) by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Discovery Responses to VSA's ROG and POD by Betty Jones.(Rolle, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#15

(#15) Initial Disclosures by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#14

(#14) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vets Securing America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company for Vets Securing America, Inc.. (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

13 #2

Exhibit Attachment C

13 #13

Main Document

#8

Clerks Notation re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Scott, Gailya) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by The Kroger Co.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Vets Securing America, Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co.. Discovery ends on 6/21/2022. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #1

Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by The Kroger Co. (Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff) (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by The Kroger Co. of Deposition of Plaintiff (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Certificate of Service (Amended) by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff's First Discovery Responses to VSA's ROG and POD by Betty Jones.(Rolle, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Disclosures by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vets Securing America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company for Vets Securing America, Inc.. (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Initial Disclosures by Vets Securing America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment C, #3 Exhibit Attachment E)(Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #11 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 6/22/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on February 9, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement and #8 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on January 31, 2022. (ash) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co..(Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Kroger Co.. (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Scott, Gailya) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Mock, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by The Kroger Co.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Vets Securing America, Inc.. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co.. Discovery ends on 6/21/2022. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Kroger Co.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11530399) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits -Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VETS SECURING AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren E.H. Meadows

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Ryan Mock, Jr.