This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2019 at 07:09:02 (UTC).

Jones v. State Of Ohio et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Jones filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State Of Ohio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01913

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rafiq Jones

St. Clairsville, OH 43950

Defendants

State of Ohio

Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction

Correctional Officer Taylor Graves

Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction

 

Court Documents

12 #4

Envelope

12 #3

USM-285

12 #2

Summons

12 #1

Complaint

#12

(#12) Notice of Compliance filed by Rafiq Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Envelope)Related document(s) #11 .(L,MI) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#11

(#11) Order. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff is ordered to submit (1) a copy of the Complaint, (2) two completed summonses for defendant Taylor Graves, (3) one completed USM 285 process receipt and return for defendant Taylor Graves, and (4) a "Notice of Compliance" with the three preceding requirements of this Order that bears an appropriate case caption for filing. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a sufficient number of summonses and U.S. Marshal forms to Plaintiff with a copy of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice for want of prosecution. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/2/19. (S,HR) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-02137. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 . This Court finds that Plaintiff's objections are without merit and are hereby OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff's remaining claims arise from an incident that occurred at LCI, in Lorain County, Ohio, venue is not proper in this Court and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 or 1404(a), this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland, which serves Lorain County. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/21/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend #6 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#6

(#6) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. Furthermore it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against the State of Ohio, ODRC, and the ODRC Director be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A. Also it is RECOMMENDED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/21/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Taylor Graves, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, and State of Ohio, filed by Rafiq Jones. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons Forms, Marshal Forms, and Service Copies) by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 05/23/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Compliance filed by Rafiq Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Envelope)Related document(s) #11 .(L,MI) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of #11 Order, blank summonses and U.S. Marshal Form mailed to Rafiq Jones at Belmont Correctional Institution, 68518 Bannock Road, St. Clairsville, Ohio 43950 on 10/2/19. (S,HR) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Order. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff is ordered to submit (1) a copy of the Complaint, (2) two completed summonses for defendant Taylor Graves, (3) one completed USM 285 process receipt and return for defendant Taylor Graves, and (4) a "Notice of Compliance" with the three preceding requirements of this Order that bears an appropriate case caption for filing. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a sufficient number of summonses and U.S. Marshal forms to Plaintiff with a copy of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice for want of prosecution. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 10/2/19. (S,HR) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (K,AR) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (K,AR) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-02137. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division at Cleveland. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ADOPTING and AFFIRMING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 . This Court finds that Plaintiff's objections are without merit and are hereby OVERRULED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Because Plaintiff's remaining claims arise from an incident that occurred at LCI, in Lorain County, Ohio, venue is not proper in this Court and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406 or 1404(a), this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland, which serves Lorain County. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 08/21/2019. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion to Correct #6 Objection to #5 Report and Recommendation. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/9/2019. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend #6 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (mdr) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) is GRANTED. Furthermore it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against the State of Ohio, ODRC, and the ODRC Director be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A. Also it is RECOMMENDED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/21/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Director, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, Taylor Graves, Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Correction, and State of Ohio, filed by Rafiq Jones. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #1 Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 6/24/2019. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Application and Affidavit by an Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons Forms, Marshal Forms, and Service Copies) by Plaintiff Rafiq Jones. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director of Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Correctional Officer "Jane" Taylor is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Department of Rehabilitation & Corrections is a litigant