This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2022 at 09:05:59 (UTC).

JONES v. SPANN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 JONES filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SPANN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CLAY D LAND and CHARLES H WEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

Referral Judge

CHARLES H WEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOUIS DAVID JONES

Respondent

Warden JAMES C SPANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODNEY ZELL

1111 Bull St

Savannah, GA 31401

Respondent Attorneys

MEGHAN H HILL

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

PAULA K SMITH

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW 03

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst JAMES C SPANN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3987319, $5 filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Habeas Final Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(ZELL, RODNEY) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit State Habeas Final Order

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to JAMES C SPANN. (ggs) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES; ORDER to Amend Petition. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 2/8/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MEGHAN H HILL on behalf of JAMES C SPANN Attorney MEGHAN H HILL added to party JAMES C SPANN(pty:res)(HILL, MEGHAN) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of JAMES C SPANN Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party JAMES C SPANN(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES re #4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition),, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, (ZELL, RODNEY) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTED Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES ); Notice to Counsel RODNEY ZELL. The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e-mail address via PACER.(ggs) Modified on 3/11/2022 (ggs). (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES re #4 Order for Response (Habeas Petition),, Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint, (ZELL, RODNEY) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of JAMES C SPANN Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party JAMES C SPANN(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MEGHAN H HILL on behalf of JAMES C SPANN Attorney MEGHAN H HILL added to party JAMES C SPANN(pty:res)(HILL, MEGHAN) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES; ORDER to Amend Petition. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 2/8/2022. (ggs) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to JAMES C SPANN. (ggs) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ggs) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES ); The signature block does not include the, address, telephone number and e-mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(ggs) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUSagainst JAMES C SPANN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3987319, $5 filed by LOUIS DAVID JONES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Habeas Final Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(ZELL, RODNEY) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meghan Hobbs Hill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith