This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2020 at 08:10:00 (UTC).

Jones v. Southeast Foods, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Southeast Foods, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00841

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lillie Jones

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Southeast Foods, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin R. Jelliffe

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, PA - Jackson

4450 Old Canton Road, Suite 200

Jackson, MS 39211-5991

Defendant Attorneys

J. Caroline Johnson

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL, PA - Oxford

P. O. Box 1396, 265 N. Lamar Blvd., Suite R

Oxford, MS 38655-1396

Wilton V. Byars, III

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL, PA - Oxford

P. O. Box 1396, 265 N. Lamar Blvd., Suite R

Oxford, MS 38655-1396

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 2/14/2020 ; Jury Trial set for the term beginning 1/4/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Discovery due by 7/21/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2020 ; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 2/17/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 4/21/2020 ; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 5/21/2020 ; Motions due by 8/4/2020; Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ; ADR Report due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/17/20 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) State Court Record by Defendant Southeast Foods, LLC (Byars, Wilton) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Southeast Foods, LLC (Byars, Wilton) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C Louisiana Secretary of State filing

1 #2

Exhibit B Notice of Service and Responses to Requests for Admissons

1 #1

Exhibit A Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southeast Foods, LLC from Circuit - Warren, case number 19,0115-CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4144350) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Service and Responses to Requests for Admissons, #3 Exhibit C Louisiana Secretary of State filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 2/14/2020 ; Jury Trial set for the term beginning 1/4/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate; Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate ; Discovery due by 7/21/2020; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2020 ; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 2/17/2020; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 4/21/2020 ; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 5/21/2020 ; Motions due by 8/4/2020; Settlement Conference set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ; ADR Report due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/17/20 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 1/16/2020. Participants: Martin Jelliffe, Caroline Johnson and Wilton Byars. The Court spoke with counsel. Order to be entered. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 1/16/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) State Court Record by Defendant Southeast Foods, LLC (Byars, Wilton) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Wilton V. Byars, III on behalf of Southeast Foods, LLC (Byars, Wilton) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southeast Foods, LLC from Circuit - Warren, case number 19,0115-CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4144350) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Service and Responses to Requests for Admissons, #3 Exhibit C Louisiana Secretary of State filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Caroline Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilton V. Byars, III