This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 05:49:34 (UTC).

Jones v. SLM Corporation, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against SLM Corporation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirsten Jones

Defendants

SLM Corporation d/b/a Sallie Mae, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

SLM Corporation doing business as Sallie Mae, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Allen Edgar Robertson, III

Attorney at Shawn Jaffer Law Firm PLLC - Dallas

8111 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75251

Shawn Jaffer

Attorney at The Shawn Jaffer Law Firm - Dallas

8111 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75251

Robert Patrick Leach

Attorney at Sean Jaffer Law Firm

8111 Lyndon B Johnson Fwy

Dallas, TX 75251

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Kristopher Sauls

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Shelby Blynn Wilson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

5700 Granite Parkway, Suite 650

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Kirsten Jones Service of Initial Disclosures (Leach, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by SLM Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Wilson, Shelby) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Trans Union, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

8 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E

8 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

8 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kirsten Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Leach, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/23/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/16/2022. (mem) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Case Summary (Sauls, Justin) Modified text on 2/15/2022 (mem). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2022. (mem) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ***COMPLAINT ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against SLM Corporation, Trans Union, LLC, filed by Kirsten Jones.(mem) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Consent to Removal

1 #3

Exhibit B - State Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit A - List of Parties/Attorneys, Status of Case, Record of Jury Request

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from Justice Court, Precinct 1, Collin County, Texas, case number 01-SC-22-00012. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8756499), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - List of Parties/Attorneys, Status of Case, Record of Jury Request, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Kirsten Jones Service of Initial Disclosures (Leach, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by SLM Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Wilson, Shelby) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Trans Union, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kirsten Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Leach, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/23/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/16/2022. (mem) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal: Case Summary (Sauls, Justin) Modified text on 2/15/2022 (mem). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2022. (mem) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***COMPLAINT ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against SLM Corporation, Trans Union, LLC, filed by Kirsten Jones.(mem) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mem) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SLM Corporation d/b/a Sallie Mae, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SLM Corporation d/b/a Sallie Mae, Inc. for SLM Corporation d/b/a Sallie Mae, Inc.. (Wilson, Shelby) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union, LLC from Justice Court, Precinct 1, Collin County, Texas, case number 01-SC-22-00012. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8756499), filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - List of Parties/Attorneys, Status of Case, Record of Jury Request, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(Sauls, Justin) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SLM Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Kristopher Sauls, Sr.