This case was last updated from PACER on 03/31/2020 at 09:06:22 (UTC).

Jones v. Poinsett County Housing Authority

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Poinsett County Housing Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Jones

Defendant

Poinsett County Housing Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trevor Scott Hawkins

Attorney at Legal Aid of Arkansas

714 South Main Street

Jonesboro, AR 72401

Kevin Robert De Liban

Attorney at Legal Aid of Arkansas

310 Mid-Continent Plaza, Suite 420

West Memphis, AR 72301

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Jones's lawyers must prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Poinsett County Housing Authority. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2020. (jak) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (additional pages included) based on a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER provisionally granting re #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 01/31/2020.(wbb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Barbara Jones against Poinsett County Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Jones. (wbb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Poinsett County Housing Authority. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Jones's lawyers must prepare a summons, which the Clerk will issue, for Poinsett County Housing Authority. Counsel must deliver process to the U.S. Marshal for the Eastern District of Arkansas. The Court directs the Marshal to serve the summons and complaint without prepayment of fees. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/19/2020. (jak) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was attached to the docket in error (additional pages included) based on a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added as an attachment to docket entry #2 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (thd) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER provisionally granting re #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 01/31/2020.(wbb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Barbara Jones against Poinsett County Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (thd). (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Jones. (wbb) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less