This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:31:24 (UTC).

Jones v. Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shirley Padmore Mensah and Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03210

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Shirley Padmore Mensah

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rochelle Jones

Defendants

Americredit Financial Services, Inc.

Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan E. Brody

Attorney at BRODY AND CORNWELL

7730 Carondelet, Ste. 135

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Louise Zimmerman

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Jeffrey S. Heuer

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL, LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Ryan C. Hardy

Attorney at SPENCER FANE LLP

1 N. Brentwood Blvd., Suite 1000

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04853, with receipt number AMOEDC-7625888, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Full State File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Petition and Summons

1 #2

Exhibit B - Full State File

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Original Filing Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Parent companies: General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: General Motors Holdings, LLC,. (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Louise Zimmerman for Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc.. (Hardy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#23

(#23) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by consent by Plaintiff Rochelle Jones. (Brody, Bryan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Rochelle Jones. (Brody, Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

20 #4

Exhibit D - Licensee Details

20 #17

Exhibit Q - Licensee Details

20 #7

Exhibit G - Licensee Details

20 #8

Exhibit H - Licensee Details

20 #5

Exhibit E - Licensee Details

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • (#24) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF No. 23) is GRANTED up to and including February 7, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/28/2020. (THL) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by consent by Plaintiff Rochelle Jones. (Brody, Bryan) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • (#22) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Americredit Financial Serivces, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 21) is GRANTED up to and including January 28, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/22/2020. (THL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Rochelle Jones. (Brody, Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract, #2 Exhibit B - MO Div. of Finance Report, #3 Exhibit C - MO Div. of Finance Report, #4 Exhibit D - Licensee Details, #5 Exhibit E - Licensee Details, #6 Exhibit F - Licensee Details, #7 Exhibit G - Licensee Details, #8 Exhibit H - Licensee Details, #9 Exhibit I - Licensee Details, #10 Exhibit J - MO Div. of Finance Report, #11 Exhibit K - Licensee Details, #12 Exhibit L - Licensee Details, #13 Exhibit M - Licensee Details, #14 Exhibit N - Licensee Details, #15 Exhibit O - Licensee Details, #16 Exhibit P - Licensee Details, #17 Exhibit Q - Licensee Details)(Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#18) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendant Paul Cerame Automotive Group's Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 17) is GRANTED up to and including January 24, 2020. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/13/2020. (THL) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Reply to Defendant Paul Cerame Automotive Group, LLCs Motion to Dismiss ;Proposed extension date January 24, 2020 by Plaintiff Rochelle Jones. (Brody, Bryan) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Retail Installment Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Associated Buyer's Order)(Hardy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc.. (Hardy, Ryan) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan C. Hardy for Defendant Paul Cerame Auto Group, Inc.. (Hardy, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Rochelle Jones.(MFG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Sarah Louise Zimmerman for Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Parent companies: General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: General Motors Holdings, LLC,. (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Americredit Financial Services, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04853, with receipt number AMOEDC-7625888, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Full State File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Heuer, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.