This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 08:03:37 (UTC).

Jones v. Metal Panels, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Metal Panels, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan M. Bazis and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00418

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian W. Jones

Defendant

Metal Panels, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erik W. Fern

Attorney at BERRY LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

6940 O Street, Suite 400

Lincoln, NE 68510

Frank M. Aerni

Attorney at BERRY LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

6940 O Street, Suite 400

Lincoln, NE 68510

Defendant Attorney

Jared J. Krejci

Attorney at SMITH, JOHNSON LAW FIRM

104 North Wheeler Avenue

Grand Island, NE 68801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 8/3/2020. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 25, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression, trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on July 14, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Defendant Metal Panels, Inc..(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/23/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent KJH Leasing Co. for Metal Panels, Inc.. by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Defendants Metal Panels, Inc., KJH Leasing Co..(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Metal Panels, Inc. (Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Removal for State Court

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Metal Panels, Inc. from District Court of Platte County, Case number CI 19-1011 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4022244) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Metal Panels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal for State Court)(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 8/3/2020. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 25, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. A telephonic conference to discuss the status of case progression, trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on July 14, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Defendant Metal Panels, Inc..(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/23/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#4) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent KJH Leasing Co. for Metal Panels, Inc.. by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Defendants Metal Panels, Inc., KJH Leasing Co..(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Metal Panels, Inc. (Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Metal Panels, Inc. from District Court of Platte County, Case number CI 19-1011 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4022244) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jared J. Krejci on behalf of Metal Panels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal for State Court)(Krejci, Jared) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less