This case was last updated from PACER on 03/17/2019 at 07:30:59 (UTC).

Jones v. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 Jones filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Love, Beal Nixon, PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01003

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heather Jones

Heather Dempsey

Defendants

Love, Beal & Nixon, PC

Midland Funding, LLC

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yaakov Saks

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

Michael N. Shannon

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms, Tull & Burrow PLLC

111 Center St., Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC answer due 3/5/2019; Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 11, 2019. (mll) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Love, Beal & Nixon, PC and Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2019. (cnn) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Jones. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS with Jury Demand against John Doe 1-25, Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1000836), filed by Heather Jones.(cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Heather Jones. (cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Love, Beal & Nixon, PC and Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/19/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 1, 2019. (cnn) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC answer due 3/5/2019; Midland Funding, LLC answer due 3/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on February 11, 2019. (mll) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC. (Shannon, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Jones. Love, Beal & Nixon, PC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Heather Jones. (cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS with Jury Demand against John Doe 1-25, Love, Beal & Nixon, PC, Midland Funding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 1000836), filed by Heather Jones.(cnn) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less