This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:20:27 (UTC).

Jones v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05130

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lena Jones

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher T. Kirchmer

Attorney at Provost Umphrey

P.O. Box 4905, 490 Park Street

Beaumont, TX 77704

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 17 - SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES - Plaintiffs shall serve completed Supplemental Disclosures as described in this Order by November 15, 2019. For cases filed or transferred after the date of this Order, Supplemental Disclosures shall be served within forty-five (45) days of the filing of the Complaint or the transfer of the case into this MDL. See order for all materials to be included in Supplemental Discovery. Other than as set forth within this order, no other extensions will be granted unless agreed to by all parties. If a Plaintiff fails to cure the deficiency within the Cure Period, Defendants may file a motion to show good cause why the case should not be subject to a sanctions order from the Court. This motion may be filed without leave of Court and without any need for further efforts to meet-and-confer. Plaintiffs shall thereafter have 10 days to file a Response to the Motion. Defendants may file a Reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiffs' Response. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each related case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/16/2019. (See order for further details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lena Jones (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9085165) (Direct File MDL from Texas). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 18 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Initial Discovery Pool) (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#2

(#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 19 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order. Initial Discovery Pool). Expert Discovery for the Trial Pool Cases shall be completed by 2/28/2020. By February 24, 2020, each side shall submit to the Court, outside of the ECF system, a memorandum in support of their proposed manner of trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing of trial(s). By March 2, 2020, the parties may submit a response to the opposing party's memorandum regarding the proposed manner of trial and order of cases for trial, and timing of trial(s). Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in each of the Trial Cases by April 3, 2020. Responses shall be filed by April 22, 2020. Replies shall be filed by April 30, 2020. The Court will set the first trial for July 20, 2020. (For details, see order) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 16. (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order Initial Discovery Pool). Daubert Motions due by January 10, 2020. Responses shall be filed by January 31, 2020. Replies shall be filed by February 14, 2020. Court will set first trial for April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/20/2019. (See order for details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 19 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order. Initial Discovery Pool). Expert Discovery for the Trial Pool Cases shall be completed by 2/28/2020. By February 24, 2020, each side shall submit to the Court, outside of the ECF system, a memorandum in support of their proposed manner of trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing of trial(s). By March 2, 2020, the parties may submit a response to the opposing party's memorandum regarding the proposed manner of trial and order of cases for trial, and timing of trial(s). Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in each of the Trial Cases by April 3, 2020. Responses shall be filed by April 22, 2020. Replies shall be filed by April 30, 2020. The Court will set the first trial for July 20, 2020. (For details, see order) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 18 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Initial Discovery Pool) (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 17 - SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES - Plaintiffs shall serve completed Supplemental Disclosures as described in this Order by November 15, 2019. For cases filed or transferred after the date of this Order, Supplemental Disclosures shall be served within forty-five (45) days of the filing of the Complaint or the transfer of the case into this MDL. See order for all materials to be included in Supplemental Discovery. Other than as set forth within this order, no other extensions will be granted unless agreed to by all parties. If a Plaintiff fails to cure the deficiency within the Cure Period, Defendants may file a motion to show good cause why the case should not be subject to a sanctions order from the Court. This motion may be filed without leave of Court and without any need for further efforts to meet-and-confer. Plaintiffs shall thereafter have 10 days to file a Response to the Motion. Defendants may file a Reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiffs' Response. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each related case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/16/2019. (See order for further details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 16. (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order Initial Discovery Pool). Daubert Motions due by January 10, 2020. Responses shall be filed by January 31, 2020. Replies shall be filed by February 14, 2020. Court will set first trial for April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/20/2019. (See order for details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(ah) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lena Jones (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9085165) (Direct File MDL from Texas). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.