This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:31:24 (UTC).

Jones v. Jegley et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Jones filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Jegley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Billy Roy Wilson and James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00234

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Billy Roy Wilson

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peggy Jones

Defendants

Tony Juneau

Sybal Jordan Hampton

Larry Jegley

Alice L Eastwood

Lori Klein

Ashley Driver Younger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Christoph Keller

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Chad W. Pekron

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

John E. Tull, III

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Brittany S. Ford

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Defendant Attorneys

William C. Bird, III

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

Daniel L. McFadden

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building, 323 Center Street, Suite 200

Little Rock, AR 72201-2610

 

Court Documents

#41

(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

40 #1

Exhibit 1

#40

(#40) MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Peggy Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#39

(#39) USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number LIT072827 re #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. (cmn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#38

(#38) ORDER of USCA as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton: Appellant is directed to show cause, within 14 days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to correct typographical error.)(cmn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#37

(#37) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #36 Motion for Reconsideration (Amended Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#36

(#36) Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#34

(#34) MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#27

(#33) USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. USCA Case Number 19-2260. (cmn) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Ashley Driver Younger served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Tony Juneau served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Sybal Jordan Hampton served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#6

(#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/23/2019. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/1/19. (mmb) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#4

(#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/01/19. (dmm) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Larry Jegley (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Larry Jegley served on 4/11/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Peggy Jones. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071591.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger. (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Peggy Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) USCA Appeal Fees received $505 receipt number LIT072827 re #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. (cmn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER of USCA as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton: Appellant is directed to show cause, within 14 days of the date of this order, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to correct typographical error.)(cmn) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #36 Motion for Reconsideration (Amended Motion for Reconsideration) filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Amended MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #34 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Stay filed by Peggy Jones. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Order on Motion to Stay by Peggy Jones (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) USCA Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule as to #27 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger, Larry Jegley, Alice L Eastwood, Tony Juneau, Sybal Jordan Hampton. USCA Case Number 19-2260. (cmn) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Stay Preliminary Injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/19/2019. (sjh) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Ashley Driver Younger served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Tony Juneau served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Sybal Jordan Hampton served on 4/25/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/23/2019. Bench Trial set for 5/5/2020 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 5/1/19. (mmb) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendants' answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Monday, May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 05/01/19. (dmm) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Larry Jegley (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. McFadden on behalf of Larry Jegley (McFadden, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Peggy Jones. Larry Jegley served on 4/11/2019. (Pekron, Chad) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Alice L Eastwood, Sybal Jordan Hampton, Larry Jegley, Tony Juneau, Lori Klein, Ashley Driver Younger and returned to counsel for service. (fjg) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Peggy Jones. No summons issued. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT071591.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.