This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2021 at 12:34:00 (UTC).

Jones v. Harold

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Jones filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Harold. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul Eugene Jones

Lewisburg, TN 37091

Defendant

Bill Harold

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: In light of the Court's explicit warning to Plaintiff that failure to show cause or to keep the Court apprised of his current address would likely result in this actions dismissal (Doc. No. 4 at 2), and pursuant to the Court's well settled... authority to dismiss sua sponte a lawsuit for failure to prosecute, Carpenter v. City of Flint, 723 F.3d 700, 704 (6th Cir. 2013), this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's ability to pursue appropriate relief in habeas corpus. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/5/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Docket sheet and filing forms returned. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones (am) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#5

(#5) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones. (am) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 DAYS of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff MUST SHOW CAUSE why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice to his ability to pursue relief in habeas corpus. Plaintiff' response to this Order must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 1:20-cv-00073. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply with this Order (or seek an extension of time within which to do so) within the time frame specified, or failure to keep the Court apprised of his current address, will likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Eugene Jones. (am) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bill Harold, filed by Paul Eugene Jones.(am) Modified Date on 11/18/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: In light of the Court's explicit warning to Plaintiff that failure to show cause or to keep the Court apprised of his current address would likely result in this actions dismissal (Doc. No. 4 at 2), and pursuant to the Court's well settled... authority to dismiss sua sponte a lawsuit for failure to prosecute, Carpenter v. City of Flint, 723 F.3d 700, 704 (6th Cir. 2013), this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's ability to pursue appropriate relief in habeas corpus. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/5/2021. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. Docket sheet and filing forms returned. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones (am) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. #4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Paul Eugene Jones. (am) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 DAYS of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff MUST SHOW CAUSE why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice to his ability to pursue relief in habeas corpus. Plaintiff' response to this Order must include the docket number assigned to this case, No. 1:20-cv-00073. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply with this Order (or seek an extension of time within which to do so) within the time frame specified, or failure to keep the Court apprised of his current address, will likely result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 11/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice mailed to pro se parties regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (am) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Eugene Jones. (am) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bill Harold, filed by Paul Eugene Jones.(am) Modified Date on 11/18/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less