This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 09:57:52 (UTC).

Jones v. Felix Gray, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Felix Gray, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10948

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meridith Jones

Defendant

Felix Gray, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason M. Leviton

Attorney at Block & Leviton LLP

260 Franklin Street, Suite 1860

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Meridith Jones. Felix Gray, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Felix Gray, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Felix Gray, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8245293 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Meridith Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Meridith Jones. Felix Gray, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Felix Gray, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Felix Gray, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8245293 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Meridith Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Leviton, Jason) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less