This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:52:02 (UTC).

Jones v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Toby Crouse and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Toby Crouse

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Jones

Defendants

C.R. Bard, Inc.

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Troy A. Brenes

Attorney at Brenes Law Group, PC

100 Spectrum Center Dr., Suite 330

Irvine, CA 92618

Adam M. Evans

Attorney at Brenes Law Group, P.C.

1200 Main Street, Suite 2120

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorneys

Brandee J. Kowalzyk

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP - Atlanta

Atlantic Station, 201 17Th Street, Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Kara Trouslot Stubbs

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC - KC

2400 Pershing Road, Suite 500

Kansas City, MO 64108-2533

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form

12 #1

Affidavit in Support

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/28/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/28/2022. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/22. (ss) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER regarding #8 order to show cause. The court is satisfied it has diversity subject matter jurisdiction. This matter shall proceed accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/2022. (srj) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Donna Kalazdy

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/9/2022. (srj) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

6 #2

ECF Registration Form

6 #1

Affidavit

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as corporate parent . (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Michael Jones. (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#2

(#2) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Michael Jones - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #3

Summons Bard Peripheral Vascular

1 #2

Summons C.R. Bard

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/4/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Troy A. Brenes for Michael Jones pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/3/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for attorney Troy A. Brenes to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5726989.) by Plaintiff Michael Jones (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Evans, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/28/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 3/28/2022. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/22. (ss) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER regarding #8 order to show cause. The court is satisfied it has diversity subject matter jurisdiction. This matter shall proceed accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/23/2022. (srj) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Donna Kalazdy)(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/9/2022. (srj) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brandee J. Kowalzyk for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5708217.) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as corporate parent . (Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc..(Stubbs, Kara) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Michael Jones. (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Michael Jones - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Evans, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5678186.), filed by Michael Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons C.R. Bard, #3 Summons Bard Peripheral Vascular)(Evans, Adam) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kara T. Stubbs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandee J Kowalzyk