This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 07:06:08 (UTC).

Jones v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Jones filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Suzanne Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00746

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Orville Jones

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel A Parmele

Attorney at Parmele Law Firm PC

1505 E Bradford Parkway

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTIONS to Report of the Magistrate Judge filed by Matthew Orville Jones. (Parmele, Daniel) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Matthew Orville Jones. The undersigned recommends the Court deny in part Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 8/3/20. (lb) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel A Parmele on behalf of Matthew Orville Jones (Parmele, Daniel) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma (OKWD) is upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, August 3, 2020. Complete information regarding the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF implementation is available at http://www.okwd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information.****Currently, you may share a single PACER account with other attorneys in your firm. With the new OKWD NextGen CM/ECF system, sharing of individual PACER accounts is prohibited. You must have an individual upgraded PACER account linked to your e-filing account. Once again, shared PACER accounts cannot be used by OKWD e-filing attorneys. ****Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the OKWD e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cannot be completed until on or after August 3, 2020. ****Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. The first step is to determine whether you have an "Upgraded" PACER account. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the OKWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on August 3, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If neither of these is true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you can link your PACER account to your new NextGen CM/ECF account. ****OKWDs current CM/ECF system will NOT be available from 11:00 AM on 07/31/20 until 8:00 AM on 08/03/20 due to the upgrade. ****Additional notices will be sent at a later date regarding the second step of this process. If you have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the OKWD Clerk's Office CM/ECF Help Desk at 405-609-5555.(knt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Orville Jones. (knt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Matthew Orville Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less