This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:18:45

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Jones against Commissioner of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 3:19-CV-00793
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Government Benefit - Social Security Disability
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge J. Phil Gilbert
  • Courthouse Illinois Southern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Commissioner of Social Security
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Amber K. Jones
  • Represented By
    • Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
  • Interested Party SSAOGC
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to P...

Free with Subscription
#4

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#2

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, and returned to Attorney Daley for service. (kls3) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
  • 07/24/2019
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Amber K. Jones. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/24/2019. (jdh) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#5) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Donald G. Wilkerson assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:19-cv-793-JPG-DGW. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Brochure)(kls3) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick J. Daley, Jr on behalf of Amber K. Jones (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amber K. Jones. (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) Summons Requested. (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Amber K. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.