This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2023 at 07:20:38 (UTC).

Jones v. Cheairs et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cheairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Tana Lin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01636

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tana Lin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terence Jones

Defendants

Best Storage Center

Melanie R Cheairs

Daniel L Fulkerson

Scott Novak

Mayer LLP

Lorance & Thompson PC

Nova Casualty Company

The Hanover Insurance Company

Best Storage

Richard Pickard doing business as Best Storage Center

Mikayla's LLC doing business as Best Storage Center

Does 1-5

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, before Judge Vaughan, filed by Terence Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Email Transmittal)(MJV) Modified on 11/17/2022 returned motion to pending status (CDA). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Email Transmittal

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** IFP Unsigned/Blank/Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/15/2022 to correct IFP application Mailed to plaintiff via USPS (MJV) Modified on 11/21/2022 Letter pulled from outgoing mail (MJV). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Terence Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) Mail addressed to Terence Jones returned as Return to Sender re instruction letter and blank summons forms mailed to Plaintiff on 11/30/2022. (LH) Modified on 1/5/2023 - letter and blank summons re-mailed to Plaintiff at same address. (LH). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: Consistent with the recent amendment of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, existing parties or intervenors are DIRECTED to file disclosure statements that states the names and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to each party or intervenor if not previously disclosed within ten (10) days of this Order. New parties or proposed intervenors who join this case going forward are DIRECTED to file such a disclosure upon their first appearance or pleading. (LH) Modified on 1/5/2023 to indicate mailing of NEF to Plaintiff (LH). (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail addressed to Terence Jones returned as Return to Sender re instruction letter and blank summons forms mailed to Plaintiff on 11/30/2022. (LH) Modified on 1/5/2023 - letter and blank summons re-mailed to Plaintiff at same address. (LH). (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Terence Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (LH) (cc: Plaintiff via US mail) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ***Action Required*** IFP Unsigned/Blank/Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/15/2022 to correct IFP application Mailed to plaintiff via USPS (MJV) Modified on 11/21/2022 Letter pulled from outgoing mail (MJV). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, before Judge Vaughan, filed by Terence Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Email Transmittal)(MJV) Modified on 11/17/2022 returned motion to pending status (CDA). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less