This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 10:16:42 (UTC).

Jones v. Cameron Independent School District

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Jones filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Cameron Independent School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00753

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Jones

Defendant

Cameron Independent School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Charles Holmes

Attorney at Law Offices of David C. Holmes

13201 Northwest Freeway Suite 800

Houston, TX 77040

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dana Jones as to Cameron Independent School District. Waiver sent on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Holmes, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13876837). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dana Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holmes, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dana Jones as to Cameron Independent School District. Waiver sent on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Holmes, David) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13876837). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dana Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holmes, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less