This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 09:25:27 (UTC).

Jones v. Byerly et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Jones against Byerly in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02078

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

David L. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Jerome Jones

Defendants

NFN Curry

NFN Byerly

John D Stubblefield

B Johnson

C Ferrell

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Order Accepting #6 Findings and Recommendations re: #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct and Replace Personal Property #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (ndt) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #3 Complaint. The Court should summarily dismiss this action without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) unless, within the time for filing objections to this recommendation or by some other deadline established by the Court, Plaintiff Kevin Jerome Jones pays the full filing fee of $400.00. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/10/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Declaration of Support in Motion filed by Kevin Jerome Jones re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Jerome Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against NFN Byerly, NFN Curry, C Ferrell, B Johnson, John D Stubblefield filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Oct 15 15:28:36 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Accepting #6 Findings and Recommendations re: #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 10/15/2019) (ndt) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct and Replace Personal Property #3 Complaint, filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. (ndt) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 10 12:31:05 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #3 Complaint. The Court should summarily dismiss this action without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) unless, within the time for filing objections to this recommendation or by some other deadline established by the Court, Plaintiff Kevin Jerome Jones pays the full filing fee of $400.00. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 9/10/2019) (aaa) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Sep 3 10:44:00 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Declaration of Support in Motion filed by Kevin Jerome Jones re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kevin Jerome Jones with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against NFN Byerly, NFN Curry, C Ferrell, B Johnson, John D Stubblefield filed by Kevin Jerome Jones. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.