This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:15:36 (UTC).

Jones v. Brandenburg et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brandenburg. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02154

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gayle Jones

Defendants

James Brandenburg

Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul D Powell

Attorney at The Powell Law Firm

8918 Spanish Ridge Avenue, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Michael A. Kristof

Attorney at Glen Lerner Injury Attorneys

4795 S. Durango Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Jared D. Powell

Attorney at The Paul Powell Law Firm

8918 Spanish Ridge Ave., Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant Attorneys

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gayle Jones. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/14/2020. Motions due by 1/13/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#12

(#12) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Gayle Jones. (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#11

(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) ERROR: Document is a duplicate of ECF No. #4 and is therefore terminated. NOTICE by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. re #4 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service on James Brandenburg re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Gayle Jones. (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc., James Brandenburg. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 12/19/2019 to add additional filing party (MMM). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/1/2020.NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/16/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate ESIS, Inc. for Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Case Number A-19-806022-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5813083) by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gayle Jones. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/14/2020. Motions due by 1/13/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Gayle Jones. (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Docket Correction to #9 Notice (Other) : ERROR: Document is a duplicate of ECF No. #4 and is therefore terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ERROR: Document is a duplicate of ECF No. #4 and is therefore terminated. NOTICE by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. re #4 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service on James Brandenburg re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Gayle Jones. (Powell, Paul) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc., James Brandenburg. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 12/19/2019 to add additional filing party (MMM). Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/1/2020.NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. A search of the court's records indicate that attorney Jared Powell is not admitted to practice in the District of Nevada pursuant to LR IA 11-1. A copy of the Motion for Admission to Practice may be obtained from the court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Michael A. Kristof is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/16/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate ESIS, Inc. for Mercer Transportation Co., Inc. added. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Case Number A-19-806022-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5813083) by Mercer Transportation Co., Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercer Transportation Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared D. Howell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Kristof