Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 08:14:05 (UTC).

Jones v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02157

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Jones

Defendants

Chattem, Inc.

Sanofi US Services, Inc.

Pfizer Inc.

Glaxosmithkline, LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Gerard Stranch, IV

Attorney at BRANSTETTER STRANCH & JENNINGS, PLLC

223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Freedom Building, Ste 200

Nashville, TN 37203

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Glaxosmithkline, LLC. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Chattem, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

17 #1

Transmittal letter

#17

(#17) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(agj) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Pfizer Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amneal Pharm, Inc, #2 Summons Amneal Pharm, LLC)(skc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Glaxosmithkline, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld) (mbm). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

1 #6

Summons Boehringer Ingelheim Summons

1 #5

Summons Sanofi US Services Inc Summons

1 #4

Summons Pfizer Inc Summons

1 #3

Summons Chattem, Inc. Summons

1 #2

Summons Glaxosmithkline Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT by Walter Jones OBO Sue Jones against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3301112), filed by Walter Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Glaxosmithkline Summons, #3 Summons Chattem, Inc. Summons, #4 Summons Pfizer Inc Summons, #5 Summons Sanofi US Services Inc Summons, #6 Summons Boehringer Ingelheim Summons)(Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Glaxosmithkline, LLC. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Chattem, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(agj) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Pfizer Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walter Jones as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amneal Pharm, Inc, #2 Summons Amneal Pharm, LLC)(skc) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Walter Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals of NY, #2 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., #3 Summons Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC)(Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE to all parties: This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex: 1:XX-cv-XXXX or 2:XX-cv-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) Case. The new case number is 1:20-cv-2157. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. 3/4/2020 (jld). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Pfizer Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Chattem, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Glaxosmithkline, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (jld) (mbm). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT by Walter Jones OBO Sue Jones against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3301112), filed by Walter Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Glaxosmithkline Summons, #3 Summons Chattem, Inc. Summons, #4 Summons Pfizer Inc Summons, #5 Summons Sanofi US Services Inc Summons, #6 Summons Boehringer Ingelheim Summons)(Stranch, J.) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi US Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant