This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:01:21 (UTC).

Jones v. Big V Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Jones filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Big. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas W. Thrash, Jr and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05572

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cassandra Jones

Atlanta, GA 30316

Casandra Jones

Morrow, GA 30260

Defendants

Big V Group, LLC

Big V Properties, LLC

BVC Crossroads South, LLC

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Big V Properties, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

5 #2

Original Waivers

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to BVC Crossroads South, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Big V Group, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Jones. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100117903) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Cassandra Jones (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Original Waivers)(anc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Cassandra Jones (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Original Waivers)(anc) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Big V Group, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Big V Properties, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to BVC Crossroads South, LLC on 12/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Cassandra Jones. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number GAN100117903) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.