This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2021 at 14:16:54 (UTC).

Jones v. Beasle et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Jones filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Beasle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Damon R Leichty and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audrain Jones

Westville, IN 46391

Defendants

Beasle

Ron Neal

Winn

Gram

Proctor

Smith

Crocket

Gill

Friday

Garcia

Burke

Brittany White

Burrell

Webb

Cross

Not Classified By Court

WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER: Audrain Jones is GRANTED until 10/12/2021 to respond to this order and CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/9/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Declaration in Support of Request for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis in RESPONSE to DE #2 Order filed by Audrain Jones. (nae) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Audrain Jones, IDOC # 133236, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $28.89 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/22/2021. (cc: Inmate Trust Fund) (lhc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 ; ORDERS the plaintiff, Audrain Jones, IDOC # 133236, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $28.89 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/22/2021. (cc: Inmate Trust Fund) (lhc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration in Support of Request for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis in RESPONSE to DE #2 Order filed by Audrain Jones. (nae) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Audrain Jones. Pursuant to General Order 2018-1, documents submitted to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kms) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Audrain Jones is GRANTED until 10/12/2021 to respond to this order and CAUTIONED if he does not respond by the deadline, this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/9/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Beasle, Burke, Burrell, Crocket, Cross, Friday, Garcia, Gill(Correctional Officer), Gram, Ron Neal, Proctor, Smith(Correctional Officer), Smith(Correctional Officer (D.H.B.)), Webb, Brittany White, Winn, filed by Audrain Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Jones)(kms) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burrell is a litigant

Latest cases where Proctor is a litigant

Latest cases where Grams is a litigant

Latest cases where Winn Companies is a litigant