This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2023 at 06:15:22 (UTC).

Jones v. Bartley et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2022 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bartley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ron Christopher Jones

Defendants

Robert Blane Bartley

AT&T Corp.

AT&T Services, Inc.

BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seth Peter Buskirk

Don T. Evans, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Nathaniel J. Pencook

Cassie Holt

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #29 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/2/2023. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order

29 #29

Main Document

#28

(#28) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 11/3/23. Mediation Deadline set for 11/3/23. The parties agree to Bonnie Weyher as mediator. Motions due by 12/6/23. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/5/23. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#27

(#27) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

#26

(#26) Notice of Appearance filed by Cassie Holt on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Holt, Cassie) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#25

(#25) Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel J. Pencook on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

#24

(#24) Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Blane Bartley (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by Robert Blane Bartley. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to C

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Cassie Holt on behalf of AT&T Corp.. (Holt, Cassie) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel J. Pencook on behalf of AT&T Corp.. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#2

(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp.. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet EDNC Supplemental Cover Sheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Case File

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #29 Consent Motion for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/2/2023. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order) (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 11/3/23. Mediation Deadline set for 11/3/23. The parties agree to Bonnie Weyher as mediator. Motions due by 12/6/23. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/5/23. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by AT&T Corp., AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance filed by Cassie Holt on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Holt, Cassie) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel J. Pencook on behalf of AT&T Services, Inc., Robert Blane Bartley, BellSouth Telecommunications, LLC. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #23 Answer to Amended Complaint. Attorney Nathaniel J. Pencook should file a Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Bartley. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Financial Disclosure Statement by Robert Blane Bartley (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, by Robert Blane Bartley. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Appearance filed by Don T. Evans, Jr on behalf of Ron Christopher Jones. (Evans, Don) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice filed by AT&T Corp. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected EDNC Supplemental Cover Sheet. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Philip A. Mullins, IV of Philip A. Mullins Law, P.C. at 3400 Croasdaile Dr., Suite 205, Durham, NC 27705; Mark D. Locklear of Law Office of Mark D. Locklear, P.L.L.C. at 321 North Elm Street, Lumberton, NC 28358 and a blank Notice of Self-Representation and Financial Disclosure Statement sent to Pro Se Defendant, Robert Blane Bartley at 207 Klepper Estates Dr., Rogersville, NC 37857 all mailed via US Mail on January 5, 2023. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-3] Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. Counsel failed to sign the supplemental removal cover sheet. Counsel needs to refile the document using the event "Notice-Other". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal. AT&T Corp. answer due 1/27/2023. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/29/2022. A copy of this order was sent to plaintiff's counsel, Philip A. Mullins, IV and Mark D. Locklear via US mail this date. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Cassie Holt on behalf of AT&T Corp.. (Holt, Cassie) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel J. Pencook on behalf of AT&T Corp.. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by AT&T Corp. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Corp.. (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T Corp. from Robeson County Superior Court, case number 22CVS03061. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 500001171), filed by AT&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Case File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet EDNC Supplemental Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Pencook, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less