This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 06:39:14 (UTC).

Jones v. AT&T Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Abbie Crites-Leoni. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abbie Crites-Leoni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David L. Jones

Sikeston, MO 63801

Defendant

AT&T Inc.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Original Filing Form

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff David L. Jones. (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David L. Jones. (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs is GRANTED. [ECF No. 3] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED as moot. [ECF No. 2] An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/2022. (JMC) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/2022. (JMC) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Jones. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Processed. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (JMC) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to David Jones. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Processed. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (JMC) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5,6. Mon May 23 16:15:43 CDT 2022 (Carter, Jessica) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/2022. (JMC) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs is GRANTED. [ECF No. 3] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED as moot. [ECF No. 2] An Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/23/2022. (JMC) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed May 18 11:01:02 CDT 2022 (admin,) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David L. Jones. (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff David L. Jones. (JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant AT&T Inc. Non-Jury Demand,, filed by David L. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(JMC) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant