This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 08:34:19 (UTC).

Jones v. Atlantic Records et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Atlantic Records. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00893

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise Jones

Pittsburgh, PA 15218

Defendants

Atlantic Records

Warner Music Group

1501 Certified Entertainment

300 Entertainment

Megan J. Pete

Jorden Thorpe

Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar

Craig Kaleman

Stephen Cooper

Carl Crawford

Kevin Liles

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 2/21/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Denise Jones. New Address: 7633 Highland Ave., Pittsburgh, PA, 15218. (sc) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION re: for confidentiality. Keep the plaintiff's address concealed to protect the safety of Denise Jones. This case is against powerful companies that already caused a substantial amount of anxiety, grief, and fear. Denise Jones moved her place of residence to protect her and her children while filing the case. A address change is already filed out and prepared to submit. After contacting the courts Denise Jones was advised to put in the motion to keep the plaintiff's addresses private for safety, they said to put in the motion before submitting the address change so the address won't be updated without the judge being notified of the request. Document filed by Denise Jones. (sac) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION re: Issue a subpoena to all defendants to authorize and order the service providers to expeditiously disclose to the copyright owner or court's information sufficient to identify the alleged infringers to the extent such information is available to the service providers. The identity of Megan J Pete, Pardison Fontaine (Jorden Thorpe), and Becalis Marlenis Almanzar. Document filed by Denise Jones. (sac) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#12

(#12) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Denise Jones 73 Knox Avenue Pittsburg, PA 15210, at, on 2/22/2022 Re: #10 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1501 Certified Entertainment, 300 Entertainment, Atlantic Records, Stephen Cooper, Carl Crawford, Craig Kaleman, Kevin Liles, Warner Music Group. (aan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for Defendants Atlantic Records, its CEO Craig Kaleman, Warner Music Group, its CEO Stephen Cooper, 1501 Certified Entertainment, its CEO Carl Crawford, 300 Entertainment, and its CEO Kevin Liles, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court declines, at this time, to direct service on Defendants Megan J. Pete, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, and Jorden Thorpe because Plaintiff has failed to provide addresses for these Defendants. The Court will entertain a request for service on these Defendants should Plaintiff provides the addresses for service. Plaintiff's request for counsel, ECF No. 8, is denied without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/18/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 02/18/2022)

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

8 #8

Main Document

#5

(#5) Original Signature Received from Denise M. Jones re: #2 Complaint. (sc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

4 #2

Consent to Electronic Service

4 #1

Complaint Signature Page

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

#1

(#7) Original Signature Received from Denise M. Jones re: #1 IFP Application. (sc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 2/21/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Denise Jones. New Address: 7633 Highland Ave., Pittsburgh, PA, 15218. (sc) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION re: for confidentiality. Keep the plaintiff's address concealed to protect the safety of Denise Jones. This case is against powerful companies that already caused a substantial amount of anxiety, grief, and fear. Denise Jones moved her place of residence to protect her and her children while filing the case. A address change is already filed out and prepared to submit. After contacting the courts Denise Jones was advised to put in the motion to keep the plaintiff's addresses private for safety, they said to put in the motion before submitting the address change so the address won't be updated without the judge being notified of the request. Document filed by Denise Jones. (sac) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION re: Issue a subpoena to all defendants to authorize and order the service providers to expeditiously disclose to the copyright owner or court's information sufficient to identify the alleged infringers to the extent such information is available to the service providers. The identity of Megan J Pete, Pardison Fontaine (Jorden Thorpe), and Becalis Marlenis Almanzar. Document filed by Denise Jones. (sac) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Denise Jones 73 Knox Avenue Pittsburg, PA 15210, at, on 2/22/2022 Re: #10 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 2/22/2022 Re: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. #10 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) 1501 Certified Entertainment, 300 Entertainment, Atlantic Records, Stephen Cooper, Carl Crawford, Craig Kaleman, Kevin Liles, Warner Music Group. (aan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1501 Certified Entertainment, 300 Entertainment, Atlantic Records, Stephen Cooper, Carl Crawford, Craig Kaleman, Kevin Liles, Warner Music Group. (aan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is instructed to issue summonses for Defendants Atlantic Records, its CEO Craig Kaleman, Warner Music Group, its CEO Stephen Cooper, 1501 Certified Entertainment, its CEO Carl Crawford, 300 Entertainment, and its CEO Kevin Liles, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. The Court declines, at this time, to direct service on Defendants Megan J. Pete, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, and Jorden Thorpe because Plaintiff has failed to provide addresses for these Defendants. The Court will entertain a request for service on these Defendants should Plaintiff provides the addresses for service. Plaintiff's request for counsel, ECF No. 8, is denied without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/18/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION FOR THE COURT TO REQUEST PRO BONO COUNSEL. Document filed by Denise Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(sc) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Original Signature Received from Denise M. Jones re: #1 IFP Application. (sc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Denise Jones consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Denise Jones.(sc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original Signature Received from Denise M. Jones re: #2 Complaint. (sc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order Directing Original Signature to Denise Jones at 73 Knox Avenue, Pittsburgh, PA 15210. (kh) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER DIRECTING ORIGINAL SIGNATURE: Plaintiff is directed to submit signed signature pages to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signature Pages due by 3/7/2022. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/3/2022) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Signature Page, #2 Consent to Electronic Service) (dmg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against 1501 Certified Entertainment, 300 Entertainment, Belcalis Marlenis Almanzar, Atlantic Records, Megan J. Pete, Jorden Thorpe, Warner Music Group. Document filed by Denise Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(rdz) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Denise Jones..(rdz) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARNER MUSIC GROUP CORP. is a litigant