This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 11:07:00 (UTC).

Jones v. Arrow Electronics Inc

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Arrow Electronics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and William J. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02418

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nina Y. Wang

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marisa Jones

Defendant

Arrow Electronics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ariel Beryl DeFazio

Attorney at Sweeney & Bechtold PC

650 South Cherry Streetsuite 700

Denver, CO 80246

Charlotte Noelle Sweeney

Attorney at Sweeney & Bechtold PC

650 South Cherry Streetsuite 700

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Rayner Mangum

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Streetsuite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

Jimmy Goh

Attorney at Constangy Brooks Smith & Prophete LLP-Denver

600 17Th Streetsuite 2700-S

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marisa Jones. Arrow Electronics Inc served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/11/2021. (Sweeney, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/22/2021. Consent Form due by 10/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/20/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/27/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Marisa Jones All parties do not consent.. (DeFazio, Ariel) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Goh, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#14

(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marisa Jones. (DeFazio, Ariel) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jimmy Goh on behalf of Arrow Electronics Inc (Goh, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jimmy Goh on behalf of Arrow Electronics Inc (Goh, Jimmy) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Marisa Jones. (DeFazio, Ariel) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER: #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Its Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand is hereby GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/01/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc3, ) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/29/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference #11 is hereby GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference is RESET for 11/9/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 11/2/2021. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/19/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc3, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Arrow Electronics Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/18/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Goh, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2020 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10 /14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/14/2021. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02418-WJM. (Text Only Entry). (alave, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Marisa Jones All parties do not consent.. (DeFazio, Ariel) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION by Defendant Arrow Electronics Inc. (Mangum, Erin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/22/2021. Consent Form due by 10/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/20/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/27/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. (alave, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marisa Jones. Arrow Electronics Inc served on 9/20/2021, answer due 10/11/2021. (Sweeney, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Arrow Electronics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8062039)Attorney Charlotte Noelle Sweeney added to party Marisa Jones(pty:pla), filed by Marisa Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sweeney, Charlotte) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arrow Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin R. Mangum