This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/27/2019 at 07:01:59 (UTC).

Jones v. Ann Arbor Pubic Schools et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2019 Jones filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ann Arbor Pubic Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Victoria A. Roberts and Michael J. Hluchaniuk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12839

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ms Carla Jones

Defendants

Board of Education Ann Arbor Public Schools

Ann Arbor Pubic Schools

Jeanice Kerr

Jeanice Kerr Swift

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Francyne B. Stacey

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Document Continuation civil cover

1 #2

Exhibit right to sue

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to File An Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *Jeanice Kerr Swift* (DWor) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for Jeanice Kerr Swift. (Stacey, Francyne) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carla Jones against Jeanice Kerr Swift. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Stacey, Francyne) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Docket[INCORRECT NAME ON SUMMONS REQUEST SHOULD BE FOR JEANICE KERR SWIFT] REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jeanice Kerr. (Stacey, Francyne) Modified on 10/8/2019 (LGra). (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Francyne B. Stacey re Request for Additional Summons. Parties listed on the initiating document were omitted.[INCORRECT NAME LISTED ON DOCKET] The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (LGra) Modified on 10/8/2019 (LGra). (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Docket[WRONG DFT NAME ON SUMMONS] REQUEST for SUMMONS for Jeanice Kerr. (Stacey, Francyne) Modified on 10/7/2019 (LGra). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Board of Education Ann Arbor Public Schools* (NAhm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Ann Arbor Pubic Schools* (NAhm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Error directed to: Francyne B. Stacey re #1 Complaint,,. Parties [JEANICE KERR SWIFT] listed on the initiating document were omitted. The filing attorney must use the docket event Addition of Parties to correct the error. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (NAhm) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT 5:19-cv-12839 filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7423916 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation civil cover, #2 Exhibit right to sue) (Stacey, Francyne) (Entered: 09/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less