This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2020 at 07:42:50 (UTC).

Jones v. American Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Jones filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ursula Ungaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-20089

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ursula Ungaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanitra Jones

Defendant

American Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leonard Rodrigue Desir, Jr.

Attorney at The Desir Law Firm

500 E Broward Blvd Suite 1710

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Defendant Attorneys

Steven William Schabacker

Attorney at Wargo & French, LLP

201 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 1000 - 10Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Diana Castiov

Attorney at Wargo French LLP

201 S. Biscayne Blvd., Suite 1000

Miami, FL 33131

Evan Michael Holober

Attorney at Wargo French LLP

201 S. Biscayne Blvd., Suite 1000

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Peter Abraham. Mediation Hearing set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Peter E. Abraham as Mediator. (Schabacker, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2020. In Limine Motions due by 7/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2020. Motions due by 7/3/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit 4: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit 3: Estimate

1 #3

Exhibit 2: Sunbiz Corp Search

1 #2

Exhibit Composite 1: Copy of all Process and Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12290430, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite 1: Copy of all Process and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2: Sunbiz Corp Search, #4 Exhibit 3: Estimate, #5 Exhibit 4: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holober, Evan) Text Modified on 1/9/2020 (cds). Answer Filed (See Exh. 2)/ No Motion To Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Peter Abraham. Mediation Hearing set for 4/3/2020 02:00 PM Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Peter E. Abraham as Mediator. (Schabacker, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2020. In Limine Motions due by 7/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2020. Motions due by 7/3/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/24/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12290430, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite 1: Copy of all Process and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2: Sunbiz Corp Search, #4 Exhibit 3: Estimate, #5 Exhibit 4: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Holober, Evan) Text Modified on 1/9/2020 (cds). Answer Filed (See Exh. 2)/ No Motion To Dismiss Filed. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan M. Holober

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diana Castiov

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven William Schabacker(Designation Retained)