This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2023 at 11:24:24 (UTC).

Jones v. ADT Security Services

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Jones filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ADT Security Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00683

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyeal Jones

Defendant

ADT Security Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley Lawrence Gibson

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony David Dick

Robert E Dezort

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to ADT Security Services on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Gibson, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony David Dick for Defendant ADT Security Services (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Dezort for Defendant ADT Security Services (Dezort, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by ADT Security Services. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants ADT Security Services, ADT Inc., ADT LLC, Apollo Global Management, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent ADT Inc., Other Affiliate ADT LLC, Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC. for ADT Security Services.. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#7

(#7) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Kyeal Jones. (Gibson, Bradley) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#8

(#8) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 4:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Motions to Amend due by 3/4/2022. Motions directed to pleadings due by 3/18/2022. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/30/2022. Defendant Primary Expert due by 7/29/2022. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 4/29/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/26/2022. Discovery due by 9/23/2022. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2022. Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/28/2022. (kkz) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/28/2022) (kkz). Modified on 1/28/2022 (kkz). (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to File Document Under Seal (Joint Motion) for Court Approval of Confidential Release and Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant ADT Security Services. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (kkz) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion for Leave to File Motion Under Seal for Court Approval of Confidential Release and Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/1/2022. (kkz) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to File Document Under Seal (Joint Motion) for Court Approval of Confidential Release and Stipulated Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendant ADT Security Services. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/4/2022; Bradley Gibson appeared for plaintiff; Anthony Dick appeared for defendant; case to proceed as discussed. (kkz) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 3/2/2022; Bradley Gibson appeared for plaintiff; Robert Dezort and Anthony Dick appeared for defendant; case matters discussed; parties to confer on possible resolution to matter; Status Conference is set for 5/4/2022 at 2:00 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. NOTE: parties shall refer to the entry on 1/28/22 for conferencing instructions. (kkz) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/2/2022 at 4:30 PM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Motions to Amend due by 3/4/2022. Motions directed to pleadings due by 3/18/2022. Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 6/30/2022. Defendant Primary Expert due by 7/29/2022. Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 4/29/2022. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/26/2022. Discovery due by 9/23/2022. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2022. Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/28/2022. (kkz) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/28/2022) (kkz). Modified on 1/28/2022 (kkz). (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Kyeal Jones. (Gibson, Bradley) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/27/2022. Please be aware that the Court has revised its Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures; visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of those required forms. (kkz) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants ADT Security Services, ADT Inc., ADT LLC, Apollo Global Management, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent ADT Inc., Other Affiliate ADT LLC, Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC. for ADT Security Services.. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by ADT Security Services. (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E Dezort for Defendant ADT Security Services (Dezort, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony David Dick for Defendant ADT Security Services (Dick, Anthony) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to ADT Security Services on 10/26/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (Gibson, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against ADT Security Services ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8559384), filed by Kyeal Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gibson, Bradley) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less