This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 11:47:40 (UTC).

Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. v. VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Melissa Damian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-21118

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Melissa Damian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.

Defendants

VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC

Reef Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Brandon Rogers

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.

201 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Matthew David Bernstein

Attorney at Shook, Hardy , Bacon

201 S. Biscayne Blvd

Citigroup Center, SU 3200

Defendant Attorney

Annette Urena Tucker

Attorney at Kaplan Zeena LLP

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 3050

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Counts II-IV by Reef Technology, Inc., VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. Responses due by 6/14/2022 (Tucker, Annette) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 3/22/2023 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/7/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2022. Mediation Deadline 12/9/2022. In Limine Motions due by 2/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2022. Motions due by 10/21/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/31/2022)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order A

1 #13

Exhibit J

1 #12

Exhibit I

1 #11

Exhibit H

1 #10

Exhibit G

1 #9

Exhibit F

1 #8

Exhibit E

1 #7

Exhibit D

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Summon(s) Summons-Reef Technology

1 #2

Summon(s) Summons-Vessel Operating

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Counts II-IV by Reef Technology, Inc., VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. Responses due by 6/14/2022 (Tucker, Annette) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Jury Trial set for 3/27/2023 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 3/22/2023 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/7/2022. Fact Discovery due by 8/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2022. Mediation Deadline 12/9/2022. In Limine Motions due by 2/17/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2022. Motions due by 10/21/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketReset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Reef Technology, Inc. response/answer due 5/31/2022; VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC response/answer due 5/31/2022. PER DE# 10 (cds) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants shall file their response by May 31, 2022. The Court will provide no further extensions of the response deadline. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/23/2022. (cpo) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Replies due by 5/31/2022. (Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Reef Technology, Inc., VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. (Tucker, Annette) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Annette Urena Tucker on behalf of Reef Technology, Inc., VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. Attorney Annette Urena Tucker added to party Reef Technology, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Annette Urena Tucker added to party VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC(pty:dft). (Tucker, Annette) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. Reef Technology, Inc. served on 4/14/2022, response/answer due 5/5/2022. (Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC served on 4/14/2022, response/answer due 5/5/2022. (Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Reef Technology, Inc., VESSEL OPERATING HOLDCO LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15553713, filed by Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons-Vessel Operating, #3 Summon(s) Summons-Reef Technology, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Rogers, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REEF TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC., A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant