This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2019 at 09:03:09 (UTC).

Jones et al v. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against PLZ Aeroscience Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00276

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sue Layman Jones

John Thomas Jones

Defendants

PLZ Aeroscience Corporation

Swift Response, LLC

Apollo Aerosol Industries, LLC

K-G Spray-Pak, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick A Cruise

Attorney at The Hamilton Firm

2401 Broad Street, Suite 102

Chattanooga, TN 37408

Hubert E Hamilton

Attorney at The Hamilton Firm

2401 Broad Street, Suite 102

Chattanooga, TN 37408

Defendant Attorneys

J Britt Phillips

Attorney at Sutter, O'Connell Co(Brentwood)

5200 Maryland Way, Suite 350

Brentwood, TN 37027

Christopher James Schroeck

Attorney at Sutter, O'Connell Co(Brentwood)

5200 Maryland Way, Suite 350

Brentwood, TN 37027

Joshua A Wolfe

Attorney at McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC (Knoxville)

520 West Summit Hill Drive, Suite 905

Knoxville, TN 37923

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Summons - K-G Spray-Pak, Inc.

14 #1

Summons - Apollo Aerosol Industries, LLC

#14

#12

11 #1

Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Summons Swift Response, LLC

1 #2

Summons Summons-PLZ Aeroscience Corporation

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Swift Response, LLC, Apollo Aerosol Industries, LLC, K-G Spray-Pak, Inc.., filed by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Apollo Aerosol Industries, LLC, #2 Summons - K-G Spray-Pak, Inc.)(Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend Complaint to Add New Parties. Plaintiffs move the Court for leave to amend their Complaint to dismiss, without prejudice, Defendant PLZ Aeroscience Corporation, and to add as Defendants, Apollo Aerosol Industries, LLC, and K-G Spray-Pak, Inc. For good cause, Plaintiffs' motion to amend [Doc. 11] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are hereby directed to separately file their Amended Complaint. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/21/19. (Steger, Christopher) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Swift Response, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Amend/Revise #1 Complaint, by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Amended Complaint)(Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party PLZ Aeroscience Corporation by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones (Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by All Defendants. (BDG) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer by Swift Response, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Schroeck on behalf of PLZ Aeroscience Corporation (Schroeck, Christopher) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones. PLZ Aeroscience Corporation served on 10/8/2019. (Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones. Swift Response, LLC served on 10/7/2019. (Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 09/27/2019. (AMP) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to PLZ Aeroscience Corporation and Swift Response, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Swift Response, LLC) (AMP) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PLZ Aeroscience Corporation, Swift Response, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4089732.), filed by John Thomas Jones, Sue Layman Jones. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons-PLZ Aeroscience Corporation, #3 Summons Swift Response, LLC)(Cruise, Patrick) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APOLLO AEROSOL INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PLZ AEROSCIENCE CORPORATION A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SWIFT RESPONSE LLC A FOREIGN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A Cruise