This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 11:12:06 (UTC).

GLJ et al v. Oxford Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 GLJ filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Oxford Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11360

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mason David Bourgeau

Defendant

Oxford Community School District

37 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Weidenfeller

Defendant Attorneys

Annabel F. Shea

John L. Miller

Kenneth B. Chapie

Timothy J. Mullins

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) [STRICKEN] COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8951683 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] (Weidenfeller, Scott) Modified on 6/21/2022 (LWag). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Weidenfeller, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman in Port Huron to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit. (SSch) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER FOR JOINT STATEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE ON COORDINATION OF RELATED LITIGATION Joint statement due by 7/11/2022 Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (WBar) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER (1) Setting Deadlines Regarding Joint Statement and Proposed Order, (2) Directing Parties to File Memoranda Regarding Timing of Qualified Immunity Motions, and (3) Directing Parties to Conduct Substantive Motion Practice in Case No. 21-cv-12871. (Joint Statement due by 7/27/2022; Qualified Immunity Memoranda due by 8/12/2022; Responses due by 8/26/2022.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KWin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/9/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (KSan) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 8/9/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KSan) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/9/2022 03:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (KSan) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER (1) Setting Deadlines Regarding Joint Statement and Proposed Order, (2) Directing Parties to File Memoranda Regarding Timing of Qualified Immunity Motions, and (3) Directing Parties to Conduct Substantive Motion Practice in Case No. 21-cv-12871. (Joint Statement due by 7/27/2022; Qualified Immunity Memoranda due by 8/12/2022; Responses due by 8/26/2022.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KWin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 7/13/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (WBar) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (SSch) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR JOINT STATEMENT AND STATUS CONFERENCE ON COORDINATION OF RELATED LITIGATION Joint statement due by 7/11/2022 Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Robert H. Cleland and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman in Port Huron to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit. (SSch) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Weidenfeller, Scott) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING #2 Amended Complaint filed by Scott Soule, Andrea Jones, Jacklyn Green, April Ventline, GEG, Jennifer Perez, AWG, GCF, Shauna Aldred, Jennifer Caddick, LAV, JAC, JME, ALF, BGF, Jack Flewelling, HPV, Kelli Diem, TWD, GMA, JNB, Christine Nelson, Cintia Stoehr, KAMP, GLJ, PMD, Mason David Bourgeau, Nichole Butler, NAS, Mark Gillim, CAH, Alicia Feltz, SAA, Heather Hull. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) [STRICKEN] AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Weidenfeller, Scott) Modified on 6/27/2022 (LWag). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER STRIKING re #1 Complaint, and DIRECTING counsel to refile the complaint to include the corrected names of the minor plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) [STRICKEN] COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-8951683 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] (Weidenfeller, Scott) Modified on 6/21/2022 (LWag). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less