This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:23 (UTC).

Jones et al v. City of Indianola et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Jones filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Indianola. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Neal B. Biggers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Neal B. Biggers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Jones

Tevin Jones

Terrance Jones

Defendants

Officer John Winford

Officer John Antonie

Officer Danielle Parker

Police Chief Edrick Hall

Officer Antwon Weeks

City of Indianola

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlos Eugene Moore

Attorney at MOORE LAW GROUP, PC

306 Branscome Drive

Grenada, MS 38901

Defendant Attorney

R. Jeff Allen

Attorney at HUNT ROSS & ALLEN

P. O. Box 1196

Clarksdale, MS 38614-1196

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones Danielle Parker served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones John Winford served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, John Winford. (Allen, R.)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1756180, filed by Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones City of Indianola served on 2/18/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Edrick Hall answer due 3/9/2020; Danielle Parker answer due 3/9/2020; John Winford answer due 3/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/14/20. (ncb)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones Edrick Hall served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, John Winford (Allen, R.)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to John Antonie, City of Indianola, Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, Antwon Weeks, John Winford. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Officer John Antonie (jla)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Officer John Antonie (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones City of Indianola served on 2/18/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Edrick Hall answer due 3/9/2020; Danielle Parker answer due 3/9/2020; John Winford answer due 3/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/14/20. (ncb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, John Winford. (Allen, R.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, John Winford (Allen, R.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones John Winford served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones Danielle Parker served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones Edrick Hall served on 1/28/2020. (Moore, Carlos)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to John Antonie, City of Indianola, Edrick Hall, Danielle Parker, Antwon Weeks, John Winford. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1756180, filed by Tevin Jones, Terrance Jones, Linda Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.