This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 15:08:00 (UTC).

Jones et al v. Becerra et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Jones filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Becerra. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. James Lorenz, Barbara Lynn Major and Allison H. Goddard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01226

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. James Lorenz

Referral Judges

Barbara Lynn Major

Allison H. Goddard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Jones

Thomas Furrh

Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.

Second Amendment Foundation

Firearms Policy Foundation

PWGG, L.P.

The Calguns Foundation

Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC

North County Shooting Center, Inc.

PWGG, L.P. doing business as Poway Weapons and Gear and PWG Range

Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC doing business as BFAM and Beebe Family Arms and Munitions

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

Martin Horan

DOES 1-20

Amicus Curiae

Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund

Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence

Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John W. Dillon

Attorney at Gatzke Dillon

2762 Gateway Road

Carlsbad, CA 92009

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Elizabeth Rosenberg

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

John Darrow Echeverria

Attorney at Office of the California Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Lisa Kobialka

Attorney at Kramer Levin LLP

990 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Kenneth M. Fitzgerald

Attorney at Fitzgerald Knaier LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

Jeremy Todd Elman

Attorney at White & Case LLP

3000 El Camino Real, 2 Palo Alto Square, Suite 900

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Robert Andrew Sacks

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1888 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by John Darrow Echeverria on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan (Echeverria, John)Attorney John Darrow Echeverria added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney John Darrow Echeverria added to party Martin Horan(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE re #52 Reply to Response to Motion, [52-1] Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Evidence in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan. (Echeverria, John) (jpp). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Firearms Policy Foundation, Thomas Furrh, Matthew Jones, North County Shooting Center, Inc., PWGG, L.P., Second Amendment Foundation, The Calguns Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Evidence in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Dillon, John) (jpp). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER: (1) Denying Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Buriae Brief [Doc. #26 ]; (2) Denying Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief '[Doc. #27 ]; (3) Denying Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence's Motion to Participate as Amicus Curiae [Doc. #33 ]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/14/2020. (CC: Attorney Admissions) (lrf) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#50) PRO HAC APPROVED: William James Taylor, Jr appearing for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#49) PRO HAC APPROVED: Jessica K. Weigel appearing for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#48) PRO HAC APPROVED: Darren A. LaVerne appearing for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#47) PRO HAC APPROVED: Karen Steinberg Kennedy appearing for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#46) PRO HAC APPROVED: Dayna Mitsue Chikamoto appearing for Amicus Everytown for Gun Safety Support Fund (no document attached) (rmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Taylor, William) (rmc). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: (1) Granting Joint Motion to Excuse all Parties from Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, and (2) Setting In-Person Attorneys-Only Case Management Conference [ECF No. #8 ]. Because Plaintiffs challenge the constitutionality of a State law and are seeking solely declaratory and injunctive relief, the parties' shared position that there is no possibility of settlement is well-founded. Therefore, the parties' Joint Motion (ECF No. #8 ) is granted and the ENE is vacated. However, the Court will require counsel to appear for an in-person, attorneys-only Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/18/2019. (lrf) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: (1) Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation, and (2) Issuing Pre-Conference Procedures. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Court vacates the ENE currently set for 9/30/2019 at 9:30 AM and resets it for 10/9/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 9/17/2019.(lrf) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION to Excuse Appearance of EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EXCUSAL FROM THE IN-PERSON PARTY ATTENDANCE REQUIREMENT at EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EXCUSAL FROM THE IN-PERSON PARTY ATTENDANCE REQUIREMENT, by Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Firearms Policy Foundation, Thomas Furrh, Matthew Jones, North County Shooting Center, Inc., PWGG, L.P., Second Amendment Foundation, The Calguns Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer E. Rosenberg in Support of Joint Motion of all Parties Seeking Excusal from the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, or, in the Alternative, Excusal from the In-Person Party Attendance Requirement, #2 Declaration Declaration of John W. Dillon in Support of Joint Motion of all Parties Seeking Excusal from the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, or, in the Alternative, Excusal from the In-Person Party Attendance Requirement)(Dillon, John) Modified to remove proposed order on 9/18/2019. QC Mailer sent re: Improper Signature, Proposed Order Attached. (sjt). (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 19cv1226-L-AHG. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/16/2019.(lrf) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held on 9/30/2019 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/22/2019.(lrf) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Xavier Becerra, Martin Horan.(Rosenberg, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Rosenberg added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Elizabeth Rosenberg added to party Martin Horan(pty:dft) (sjt). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Furrh, The Calguns Foundation, Firearms Policy Foundation, North County Shooting Center, Inc., Matthew Jones, Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, PWGG, L.P..New Summons Requested. (Dillon, John) (sjt). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, DOES 1-20, Martin Horan filed by Thomas Furrh, The Calguns Foundation, Firearms Policy Foundation, North County Shooting Center, Inc., Matthew Jones, Beebe Family Arms and Munitions LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation, PWGG, L.P. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12677130). (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1226-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Dillon, John)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PWGG, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALGUNS FOUNDATION, INC., (CGF) is a litigant

Latest cases where Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence is a litigant