This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2023 at 11:40:49 (UTC).

Jones et al v. Bain Capital Private Equity et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Jones filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bain Capital Private Equity. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02892

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jessica Jones

Christina Lorenzen

Defendants

Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc.

Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC

Bain Capital Private Equity

Jeff Webb

U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.

Varsity Brands, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Rayhill

Ashlea Schwarz

Joseph R Saveri

Steven N. Williams

Daniel C. Hedlund

Daniel J Nordin

Elissa Amlin Buchanan

Daniel E. Gustafson

Van Davis Turner, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

George Cary

Matthew Sinon Mulqueen

Steven Kaiser

Adam S. Baldridge

Paul Coggins

Grady M. Garrison

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#475

(#475) ORDER GRANTING #333 INDIRECT PURCHASERS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #55 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on August 31, 2023. (shl) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#473

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#472

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#471

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#469

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#451

RESTRICTED

#333

(#475) ORDER GRANTING #333 INDIRECT PURCHASERS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #55 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on August 31, 2023. (shl) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

#55

(#475) ORDER GRANTING #333 INDIRECT PURCHASERS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #55 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on August 31, 2023. (shl) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

804 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#475) ORDER GRANTING #333 INDIRECT PURCHASERS' MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #55 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on August 31, 2023. (shl) (Entered: 08/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#474) TRANSCRIPT RELEASE NOTICE: By Administrative Order 2008-35 the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee implemented a policy regarding remote access to electronic transcripts. Pursuant to that policy, as well as Civil Rule 5.2 and Criminal Rule 49.1, each party's attorney is required to review a transcript for information that should be redacted pursuant to the Judicial Conference's privacy policy which requires that Social Security numbers be redacted to show only the last four digits; birth dates should contain only the year of birth; individuals known to be minors should be referred to with initials; and financial account numbers should be redacted to the last four digits. Additionally, in criminal case files, home addresses should reveal only the city and state of residence.Our records indicate that the 90-day restriction on public access to an electronic transcript(s) in this matter will lapse within 10 days. If a redaction request is required but has not been filed, please do so immediately. Please feel free to contact our office for further guidance on this issue. (re: DE#451 ; release date 8/7/2023) (tlh) (Entered: 07/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#473) Sealed Document /Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC's Individual Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#472) Sealed Document /Bain Individual Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#471) Sealed Document /Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Joint Motion for Summary Judgment. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#470) Sealed Document . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CF - Depo. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit CG Discovery Doc, #3 Exhibit CH Discovery Doc, #4 Exhibit CI Discovery Doc, #5 Exhibit CJ Discovery Doc, #6 Exhibit CK Discovery Doc, #7 Exhibit CL - Depo. Excerpts, #8 Exhibit CM - Declaration, #9 Exhibit CN - Depo. Excerpts, #10 Exhibit CO - Declaration, #11 Exhibit CP - Depo. Excerpts, #12 Exhibit CQ - Depo. Excerpts, #13 Exhibit CR - Declaration, #14 Exhibit CS - Discovery Doc, #15 Exhibit CT - Discovery Doc, #16 Exhibit CU - Depo. Excerpts, #17 Exhibit CV - Discovery Doc, #18 Exhibit CW - Discovery Doc, #19 Exhibit CX - Discovery Doc, #20 Exhibit CY - Depo. Excerpts, #21 Exhibit CZ - Depo. Excerpts, #22 Exhibit DA - Depo. Excerpts, #23 Exhibit DB - Depo. Excerpts, #24 Exhibit DC - Depo. Excerpts, #25 Exhibit DD - Discovery Doc, #26 Exhibit DE - Discovery Doc, #27 Exhibit DF - Discovery Doc, #28 Exhibit DG - Depo. Excerpts, #29 Exhibit DH - Depo. Excerpts)(Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#469) Sealed Document USASF's Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Riccio, Nicole) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#468) Sealed Document . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Depo. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Discovery Doc, #3 Exhibit C - Discovery Doc, #4 Exhibit D - Discovery Doc, #5 Exhibit E - Discovery Doc, #6 Exhibit F - Discovery Doc, #7 Exhibit G - Depo. Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H - Depo. Excerpts, #9 Exhibit I - Depo. Excerpts, #10 Exhibit J - Depo. Excerpts, #11 Exhibit K - Depo. Excerpts, #12 Exhibit L Declaration, #13 Exhibit M - Discovery Doc, #14 Exhibit N - Discovery Doc, #15 Exhibit O - Depo. Excerpts, #16 Exhibit P - Discovery Doc, #17 Exhibit Q - Depo. Excerpts, #18 Exhibit R - Discovery Doc, #19 Exhibit S - Discovery Doc, #20 Exhibit T - Discovery Doc, #21 Exhibit U - Discovery Doc, #22 Exhibit V - Discovery Doc, #23 Exhibit W - Discovery Doc, #24 Exhibit X - Discovery Doc, #25 Exhibit Y - Discovery Doc, #26 Exhibit Z - Backup Mat., #27 Exhibit AA - Discovery Doc, #28 Exhibit AB - Discovery Doc, #29 Exhibit AC - Discovery Doc, #30 Exhibit AD - Discovery Doc, #31 Exhibit AE - Discovery Doc, #32 Exhibit AF - Discovery Doc, #33 Exhibit AG - Discovery Doc, #34 Exhibit AH - Discovery Doc, #35 Exhibit AI - Depo. Excerpts, #36 Exhibit AJ - Discovery Doc, #37 Exhibit AK - Depo. Excerpts, #38 Exhibit AL - Depo. Excerpts, #39 Exhibit AM - Depo. Excerpts, #40 Exhibit AO - Discovery Doc, #41 Exhibit AP - Discovery Doc, #42 Exhibit AQ - Discovery Doc, #43 Exhibit AR - Discovery Doc, #44 Exhibit AS Declaration, #45 Exhibit AT - Discovery Doc, #46 Exhibit AU - Discovery Doc, #47 Exhibit AV - Discovery Doc, #48 Exhibit AW - Discovery Doc, #49 Exhibit AX - Discovery Resp., #50 Exhibit AY - Depo. Excerpts, #51 Exhibit AZ - Depo. Excerpts, #52 Exhibit BA - Depo. Excerpts, #53 Exhibit BB - Discovery Doc, #54 Exhibit BC - Depo. Excerpts, #55 Exhibit BD - Depo. Excerpts, #56 Exhibit BE - Depo. Excerpts, #57 Exhibit BF - Depo. Excerpts, #58 Exhibit BG - Depo. Excerpts, #59 Exhibit BH - Depo. Excerpts, #60 Exhibit BI - Depo. Excerpts, #61 Exhibit BJ - Depo. Excerpts, #62 Exhibit BK (Part 1) - Discovery Doc, #63 Exhibit BK (Part 2) - Discovery Doc, #64 Exhibit BL - Depo. Excerpts, #65 Exhibit BM - Discovery Doc, #66 Exhibit BN - Discovery Doc, #67 Exhibit BO - Discovery Doc, #68 Exhibit BP - Depo. Excerpts, #69 Exhibit BQ - Depo. Excerpts, #70 Exhibit BR - Discovery Doc, #71 Exhibit BS - Depo. Excerpts, #72 Exhibit BT - Depo. Excerpts, #73 Exhibit BU - Depo. Excerpts, #74 Exhibit BV - Discovery Doc, #75 Exhibit BW - Discovery Doc, #76 Exhibit BX - Discovery Doc, #77 Exhibit BY - Discovery Doc, #78 Exhibit BZ - Discovery Doc, #79 Exhibit CA - Discovery Doc, #80 Exhibit CB - Discovery Doc, #81 Exhibit CC - Discovery Doc, #82 Exhibit CD - Discovery Doc)(Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#467) Sealed Document Jeff Webb's Individual Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (re Document No. 466). (Gaffney, Brendan) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#466) Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bain Capital Private Equity, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc., Jeff Webb. (Mulqueen, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
454 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Lorenzen, Michelle Velotta, Jessica Jones. Bain Capital Private Equity waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021; Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021; Varsity Brands, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021; Varsity Brands, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021; Varsity Spirit Fashions & Supplies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Turner, Van) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPEAR IN SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #8 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/15/20. (shl) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Emergency MOTION Leave to appear in Pretrial Conference in Docket No. 2:20-cv-02892 Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Turner, Van) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bain Capital Private Equity. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(jld) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham no longer assigned to case. (jld) Modified on 12/11/2020 (jld).Related Judge Lipman and Judge Claxton case 20-2600 stated on civil cover sheet. (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3502801), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Turner, Van) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less