This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:58:53 (UTC).

Jonathan VanLoan v. The Nation of Islam et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Jonathan VanLoan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against The Nation of Islam. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Defendants

Samuel Lee

Gleam Davis

Aurelio Mattucci

The City of Culver City, CA

The Nation of Islam

Ryan Thompson

Michael VanHook

Thomas Small

Kimberly Turner

Tim Goodrich

Tyrone Gribben

Kevin McKeown

Sean Fowler

Mir Nawaz Karim

Providence Health and Services

Patrick Furey

Meghan Sahli-Wells

Southern California Hospital

American Youth Hostels, Inc.

Goran Erikkson

34 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

CV-71

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO PRO SE LITIGANT REGARDING PROCEDURES INCIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), service of the summons and complaint must be accomplished on each named Defendant (there are more than 50 individuals and entities in the complaint) within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. The 90-day period will expire on April 9, 2019. (See Minute Order for further details) (vm) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan. (esa) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against defendants American Youth Hostels, Inc., Steven Armenta, Scott Bixby, George Chen, Gleam Davis, Jason Driver, Goran Erikkson, Louis Farrakhan, Sean Fowler, Patrick Furey, James Gladden, Richard Glimp, Tim Goodrich, Tyrone Gribben, Mike Griffiths, Milton Herring, Sue Himmelrich, Rodney F. Hochman, Hostelling International, Eve Irvine, Lisa Kahn, Mir Nawaz Karim, Michael Klepin, Samuel Lee, Leonard Green and Partners, Aurelio Mattucci, Brian McGee, Kevin McKeown, Tony Muhammad, Terry ODay, Garry Olney, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Providence Health and Services, Providence Little Company of Mary Medical Center Torrance Prospect Medical Group, Jonathan Reitman, Geoff Rizzo, Meghan Sahli-Wells, Kenneth Semko, Marat Shpolyansky, Thomas Small, Southern California Hospital, Patrick Sullivan, The City of Culver City, CA, The City of Santa Monica, CA, The City of Torrance, CA, The Nation of Islam, Ryan Thompson, Michael Tolwin, Tolwin Psychiatric Medical Group, Inc., Kimberly Turner, Michael VanHook, Tony Vazquez, Ted Winterer Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner,(Filing fee$400 paid), filed by plaintiff Jonathan VanLoan. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Youth Hostels, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nation of Islam is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Providence Health & Services is a litigant