This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:37:26 (UTC).

Jolteus et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Jolteus filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derson Jolteus

Silver Spring, MD 20904

Magda Saintelus Jolteus

Silver Spring, MD 20904

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

EAN Holdings, LLC

Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Michelle Noorani

Attorney at Lawrence Law, LLC

Suite 700, 323 W. Camden Street

Baltimore, MD 21201

Jack D Lapidus

Attorney at Macleay Lynch & Lapidus, PC

6106 Macarthur Blvd, Suite 110

Bethesda, MD 20816

 

Court Documents

27 #20

Exhibit

27 #19

Exhibit

27 #16

Exhibit

27 #13

Exhibit

27 #11

Exhibit

27 #9

Exhibit

27 #8

Exhibit

27 #4

Exhibit

27 #2

Exhibit

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint, by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint, by Ford Motor Company.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

2 #2

State Court Writ of Summons

2 #1

State Court Case Information Report

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Exhibit Citizenship of EAN

1 #2

Exhibit Email Confirming Citizenship

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Montgomery County, case number 485591V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9696265), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Email Confirming Citizenship, #3 Exhibit Citizenship of EAN)(Noorani, Michelle) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Local Rule ADDITIONAL STATE COURT DOCUMENTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Noorani, Michelle) Modified on 2/2/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) LETTER ORDER Extending deadlines by 90 days; case is informally Stayed; the parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 10 days of the appearance of counsel for the plaintiffs or in 90 days, whichever occurs first; the Telephone conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, February 2, 2022 at 2:30 p.m. is cancelled. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/28/2022. (c/m 1/28/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The attorneys' appearance had been filed in error and has been removed. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/28/2022. (imws, Chambers) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) -SEALED- MOTION for Extension of Time by Derson Jolteus, Magda Saintelus Jolteus (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Correspondence re: withdrawal of appearance and extension of deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting document)(Bender, Bruce) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Derson Jolteus, Magda Saintelus Jolteus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting documents, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bender, Bruce) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) (FILED IN ERROR) RETURN PLEADING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/28/2022. (c/m 01/28/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2022: #1 First Page of Returned Document) (heps, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 1/28/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC, Ford Motor Company Defendants' Joint Statement Regarding Removal (Noorani, Michelle) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by EAN Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Travelers, Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent EAN Holdings, LLC for EAN Holdings, LLC.(Lapidus, Jack) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Travelers, Corporate Parent Enterprise RAC Company of Baltimore, LLC, Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC.(Lapidus, Jack) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/18/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/14/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint, by EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint, by Ford Motor Company.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against EAN Holdings, LLC, Enterprise RAC Co. of Maryland, LLC, Ford Motor Company, filed by Derson Jolteus, Magda Saintelus Jolteus. (Attachments: #1 State Court Case Information Report, #2 State Court Writ of Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Montgomery County, case number 485591V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9696265), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Email Confirming Citizenship, #3 Exhibit Citizenship of EAN)(Noorani, Michelle) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Noorani