This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:37:34 (UTC).

JOJO Business Consulting LLC v. Salahaldeen et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 JOJO Business Consulting LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Salahaldeen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew F. Leitman and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-13575

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Leitman

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOJO Business Consulting LLC

Defendants

Reyad Atallah Salahaldeen

ARS Holdings International LLC

BioConfirm Laboratory USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Augustine O. Igwe

Attorney at Kaufman, Payton & Chapa

200 Kaufman Financial Center, 30833 Northwestern Highway

Farmington Hills, MI 48334-2551

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Termination Letter

#5

(#5) ORDER to Show Cause or File an Amended Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 12/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *ARS Holdings International LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) Order Vacating #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Reyad Atallah Salahaldeen* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -Termination Letter) (Igwe, Augustine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B -Termination Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by JOJO Business Consulting LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7511536 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Termination Letter) (Igwe, Augustine) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *BioConfirm Laboratory USA LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Vacating #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -Termination Letter) (Igwe, Augustine) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to Show Cause or File an Amended Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 12/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued for *Reyad Atallah Salahaldeen* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *BioConfirm Laboratory USA LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *ARS Holdings International LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by JOJO Business Consulting LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7511536 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Termination Letter) (Igwe, Augustine) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less