This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:44:02 (UTC).

Joiner v. Evans et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Joiner filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Evans. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CT-03383

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner

Windsor, NC 27983

Defendants

NC Department of Public Safety

Bertie Correctional Institution

Charlotte A. Evans

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Proposed Order to Show Cause for An Preliminary Injunction filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Proposed Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

12 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the court DENIES plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis (DE 2), and DISMISSES the action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). This case is closed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/17/2020. Sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution with a copy of appeal rights memo. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter from plaintiff to Mr. Sapper. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

1 #1

Documents in Support

#13

(#13) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #11 Notice of Appeal. (Copy to plaintiff.) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#14

(#14) US Court of Appeals Case Number 20-6154 (Emily Borneisen, Case Manager) as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

11 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bertie Correctional Institution, Charlotte A. Evans and NC Department of Public Safety filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Attachment: #1 Documents in Support) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#12

(#12) Declaration of Inmate Filing regarding #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner as to #5 Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #6 Clerk's Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/16/2020. Sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) US Court of Appeals Case Number 20-6154 (Emily Borneisen, Case Manager) as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner (Collins, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4th Circuit Court of Appeals regarding #11 Notice of Appeal. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals regarding #11 Notice of Appeal. (Copy to plaintiff.) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Declaration of Inmate Filing regarding #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner as to #5 Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, #6 Clerk's Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Order to Show Cause for An Preliminary Injunction filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from plaintiff to Mr. Sapper. (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the court DENIES plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis (DE 2), and DISMISSES the action under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). This case is closed. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/17/2020. Sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution with a copy of appeal rights memo. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/16/2020. Sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCase Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for complaint review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner at Bertie Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bertie Correctional Institution, Charlotte A. Evans and NC Department of Public Safety filed by Raymond Dakim Harris Joiner. (Attachment: #1 Documents in Support) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less