This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2021 at 05:09:59 (UTC).

JOIANNA, INC. v. ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 JOIANNA, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joianna, Inc.

Defendants

ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY

ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taylor Leigh Kosla

Attorney at Agruss Law Firm, Llc

4809 N. Ravenswood Ave., Suite 419

Chicago, IL 60640

Michael S. Agruss

Attorney at Agruss Law Firm LLC

4619 N Ravenswood Ave, Suite 303A

Chicago, IL 60640

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce Michael Lichtcsien

Attorney at Hinkhouse Williams Walsh

180 N. Stetson Avenue, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathan Robert Puskar

Attorney at Hinkhouse Williams Walsh LLP

180 North Stetson, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

24 #1

*Restricted*

#24

(#24) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#23

(#23) TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Pennsylvania the electronic record. (bg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#22

(#22) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Western District of Pennsylvania (bg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#21

(#21) AGREED Confidentiality Order Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/09/2020.(rbf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's Joint Motion for Protective Order #18 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of Service of Erie Indemnity Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien on behalf of Erie Indemnity Company (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

18 #1

Exhibit Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order

#18

(#18) MOTION by Defendant Erie Indemnity Company for protective order Joint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of Service by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien on behalf of Erie Indemnity Company (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Erie Indemnity Company by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#6

(#6) AMENDED complaint by Joianna, Inc. against Erie Indemnity Company and terminating Erie Insurance Company (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice for want of jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted 28 days in which to file an amended complaint that adequately alleges a basis for this Court's jurisdiction, lest this case be dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/16/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joianna, Inc. by Michael S. Agruss (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joianna, Inc. by Taylor Leigh Kosla (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joianna, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17210806. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04114. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Pennsylvania the electronic record. (bg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2969 Conditional Transfer Order filed 1/21/2021 (bg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Western District of Pennsylvania (bg, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AGREED Confidentiality Order Signed by the Honorable Beth W. Jantz on 11/09/2020.(rbf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Defendant's Joint Motion for Protective Order #18 is granted. Enter Agreed Confidentiality Order. (rbf, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of Service of Erie Indemnity Company's Answers and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien on behalf of Erie Indemnity Company (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION by Defendant Erie Indemnity Company for protective order Joint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of Service by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien on behalf of Erie Indemnity Company (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Beth W. Jantz: Telephonic status hearing held on 10/01/2020. Written discovery to be completed by 02/08/2021; Fact discovery deadline remains 06/30/2021 #12 . A joint status report regarding progress of discovery is due by 02/11/2021. As discussed during the hearing, the Court understands that many parties would prefer to take depositions in person, but given the current public health situation, depositions should be planned in most instances to be taken by remote means for the foreseeable future in order to promote safety, unless agreed otherwise by all parties, counsel, and the deponent. Delay due to a desire to take in-person depositions at a later date generally will not be a basis for extending the deadline for fact discovery. If the parties would like to schedule a settlement conference with the Court, they may jointly contact this Court's courtroom deputy for available dates. (rbf, ) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Erie Indemnity Company by Bruce Michael Lichtcsien (Lichtcsien, Bruce) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Erie Indemnity Company (mp, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED complaint by Joianna, Inc. against Erie Indemnity Company and terminating Erie Insurance Company (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's complaint without prejudice for want of jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted 28 days in which to file an amended complaint that adequately alleges a basis for this Court's jurisdiction, lest this case be dismissed. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/16/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Erie Insurance Company (mp, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joianna, Inc. by Michael S. Agruss (Agruss, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joianna, Inc. by Taylor Leigh Kosla (Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Joianna, Inc. ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17210806. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kosla, Taylor) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERIE INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ERIE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S Agruss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor L Kosla