This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2020 at 09:24:51 (UTC).

Johny v. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Johny filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are George W. Cannon, Jr and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenia Johny

Defendant

Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC

P.O. Box 26303, Southside Business Center, Castle Coakley

Christiansted, VI 00824

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan W. Greene

15-B Norre Gade, P.O. Box 1197

St. Thomas, VI 00804

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Affidavit

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenia Johny. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-859932.)filed by Kenia Johny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenia Johny. Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (TNS) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC. (TNS) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Petro Industrial Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-859932.)filed by Kenia Johny. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less