This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2020 at 09:04:17 (UTC).

Johnston v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Johnston filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chubb Group of Insurance Companies. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Johnston

Defendants

Great Northern Insurance Company

Chubb Group of Insurance Companies

Webster County Coal, LLC

Sheri Conn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zack N. Womack

Attorney at Womack Law Offices

304 First Street, P.O. Box 637

Henderson, KY 42420

Defendant Attorneys

Jill F. Endicott

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

Melanie J. Kilpatrick

Attorney at Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 375

Lexington, KY 40517

John Michael Williams

Attorney at Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 375

Lexington, KY 40517

John C. Whitfield

Attorney at Whitfield Bryson & Mason, LLP

19 N. Main Street

Madisonville, KY 42431

Natasha C. Camenisch

Attorney at Whitfield Bryson & Mason, LLP

19 N. Main Street

Madisonville, KY 42431

Devon M. Landman

Attorney at Whitfield Bryson LLP - Nashville

518 Monroe Street

Nashville, TN 37208

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Endicott, Jill) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Filing by Christopher Johnston re #10 MOTION to Remand (Womack, Zack) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 4/8/20 granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Devon Landman cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

10 #8

Proposed Order

10 #7

Exhibit 6 Letter from Chubb Group of Insurance Companies

10 #6

Exhibit 5 Letter to Chubb Group of Insurance Companies

10 #5

ExhibitExhibit 4 Answer/Counterclaim/Crossclaim

10 #4

Exhibit 3 Petition to Appoint Administratrix

10 #3

Exhibit 2 Petition for Declaration of Rights and/or Declaratory Judgment

10 #2

Exhibit 1 Complaint with Jury Demand

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Christopher Johnston (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 Petition for Declaration of Rights and/or Declaratory Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 Petition to Appoint Administratrix, #5Exhibit 4 Answer/Counterclaim/Crossclaim, #6 Exhibit 5 Letter to Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, #7 Exhibit 6 Letter from Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, #8 Proposed Order) (Womack, Zack) Modified docket text on 4/13/2020 (DJT). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing by Sheri Conn re #8 MOTION for Devon Landman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3079088. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Whitfield, John) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Devon Landman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3079088. by Defendant Sheri Conn (Whitfield, John) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Endicott, Jill) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Devon M. Landman re Answer to Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/13/2020. (KJA) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Endicott, Jill) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing by Christopher Johnston re #10 MOTION to Remand (Womack, Zack) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 4/8/20 granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Devon Landman cc: Counsel(DJT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Christopher Johnston (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit 2 Petition for Declaration of Rights and/or Declaratory Judgment, #4 Exhibit 3 Petition to Appoint Administratrix, #5Exhibit 4 Answer/Counterclaim/Crossclaim, #6 Exhibit 5 Letter to Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, #7 Exhibit 6 Letter from Chubb Group of Insurance Companies, #8 Proposed Order) (Womack, Zack) Modified docket text on 4/13/2020 (DJT). (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Good Standing by Sheri Conn re #8 MOTION for Devon Landman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3079088. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Whitfield, John) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Devon Landman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3079088. by Defendant Sheri Conn (Whitfield, John) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Endicott, Jill) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Devon M. Landman re Answer to Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/13/2020. (KJA) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sheri Conn. (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint by Webster County Coal, LLC. (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Webster Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/24/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Chubb Ltd. for Great Northern Insurance Company.. (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Great Northern Insurance Company from Webster Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00034. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3070816, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Filings) (DJT) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Great Northern Insurance Company is a litigant