This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:30:18 (UTC).

Johnston et al v. The United States

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Johnston filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against The United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01354

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy James Johnston

Titusville, FL 32780-5881

Catherine Ann Johnston

Titusville, FL 32780

Defendant

The United States

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiffs to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 3), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 2). Responses due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/12/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B,C,D, #3 Exhibit E,F,G,H, #4 Exhibit I,J,K, #5 Affidavit Timothy Johnston, #6 Affidavit Catherine Johnston)(SPM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in support re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Catherine Ann Johnston, Timothy James Johnston. (SPM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #2

Exhibit B,C,D

7 #3

Exhibit E,F,G,H

7 #4

Exhibit I,J,K

7 #5

Affidavit Timothy Johnston

7 #6

Affidavit Catherine Johnston

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The United States Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-084228 filed by Timothy James Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-K (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM) Modified on 8/1/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D-K

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Proposed Amended Complaint

5 #2

Memorandum in Support of Amended Complaint

5 #3

Affidavit

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER directing compliance with the Court's Orders directing Plaintiffs to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doc. 3), and to certify compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d) (Doc. 2). Responses due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/12/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in support re #7 Amended Complaint filed by Catherine Ann Johnston, Timothy James Johnston. (SPM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against The United States filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Timothy James Johnston, Catherine Ann Johnston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B,C,D, #3 Exhibit E,F,G,H, #4 Exhibit I,J,K, #5 Affidavit Timothy Johnston, #6 Affidavit Catherine Johnston)(SPM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Set/reset deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/2/2019 (SPM) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 motion to amend/correct. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before September 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/15/2019. (SDR) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Timothy James Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Memorandum in Support of Amended Complaint, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(SPM) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER to strike and delete Docket Entries 1-1 and 1-4 from the record. The Clerk is further directed to terminate Catherine Ann Johnston as a Plaintiff in this matter and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/31/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/29/2019. (DJD) ctp (AKC). (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/12/2019. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 7/29/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The United States Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-084228 filed by Timothy James Johnston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D-K (STRICKEN AND DELETED), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPM) Modified on 8/1/2019 (SPM). (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.