This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2022 at 08:26:17 (UTC).

Johnson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01165

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Christine M. Arguello

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Johnson

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George E. McLaughlin

Attorney at McLaughlin Law Firm, P.C.

1890 Gaylord Street

Denver, CO 80206

Defendant Attorney

Sean Kenneth Burke

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP-DC

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Submitted, No Summons Issued. (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01165-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 May 2022. Consent Form due by 7/7/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/14/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2022 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Kenneth Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc.Attorney Sean Kenneth Burke added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Johnson. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/10/2022. (McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sandra Johnson All parties do not consent.. (McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/7/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01165-CMA. (trvo, ) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. answer due 7/11/2022. (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8 July 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8 July 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/12/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. answer due 7/11/2022. (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/7/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/7/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01165-CMA. (trvo, ) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01165-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Sandra Johnson All parties do not consent.. (McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sandra Johnson. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/10/2022. (McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Kenneth Burke on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc.Attorney Sean Kenneth Burke added to party Wright Medical Technology, Inc.(pty:dft) (Burke, Sean) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11 May 2022. Consent Form due by 7/7/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/14/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2022 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-01165-NRN. (athom, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Submitted, No Summons Issued. (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8450402)Attorney George E. McLaughlin added to party Sandra Johnson(pty:pla), filed by Sandra Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McLaughlin, George) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean K. Burke