This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2019 at 07:41:03 (UTC).

Johnson v. W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against W L Gore Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02316

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roosevelt Johnson, III

St. Louis, MO 63114

Defendant

W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc

555 Paper Mill Road

Newark, DE 197111

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel R. Brown

Attorney at SMITH BROWN, LLC

9100 Overland Plaza

Overland, MO 63114

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan T. Barton

Attorney at STANTON BARTON LLC

8000 Maryland Ave., Suite 450

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Roosevelt Johnson, III.(BAK) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C-State Court Notice

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1622-cc10491, with receipt number AMOEDC-7383620, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B-Petition, #4 Exhibit C-State Court Notice, #5 Original Filing Form)(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

7 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit A-State Court FIlings

7 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #3

Exhibit B-Petition

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Roosevelt Johnson, III. (Brown, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Roosevelt Johnson, III. (Brown, Daniel) filed by Roosevelt Johnson, III ; ORDERED GRANTED.( Response to Court due by 10/3/2019.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 09/23/2019. (AAS) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Roosevelt Johnson, III. (Brown, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Barton, Jonathan) filed by W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/14/19. (KJS) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc Sent To: Plaintiff (BAK) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. Attorney notified to file Notice to Plaintiff of Removal. (BAK) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Roosevelt Johnson, III.(BAK) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, case number 1622-cc10491, with receipt number AMOEDC-7383620, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit B-Petition, #4 Exhibit C-State Court Notice, #5 Original Filing Form)(Barton, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.