This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/16/2021 at 10:55:41 (UTC).

Johnson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgett M. Johnson

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Carlton Sims, Jr.

Attorney at Law Office of J. Carlton Sims, Jr.

P.O. Box 373

Montgomery, AL 36101

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Scott Harbuck

Attorney at Harbuck Keith & Holmes LLC

3595 Grandview Parkway; Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35243

Lynlee Wells Palmer

Attorney at Harbuck Keith & Holmes LLP

3595 Grandview Parkway; Suite 400

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Filing Fee Receipt

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: A Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 6/22/2022 in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 trial term in Montgomery, AL before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Mediation Notice due by 12/17/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/12/2021. Furnished Calendar, AG.(dmn, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Palmer, Lynlee) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 26(f) ORDER directing the parties to file the Rule 26(f) report containing the proposed discovery plan as soon as practicable but not later than 3/15/2021 as further set out in the order. The parties are hereby reminded that each has the right to consent or request reassignment. The parties should now confirm their selection in writing. Accordingly, counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 3/8/2021 as further set out in the order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/3/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: It is ORDERED that the motion for extension of time (Doc. #8 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Defendant has filed its answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/1/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Palmer, Lynlee) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Palmer, Lynlee) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Attorney Jonathan Scott Harbuck added for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (dmn, ) (see Doc. #8 for pdf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Palmer, Lynlee) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Order signed by Roy Prodanska for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP served 1/27/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by name illegible for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP c/o Michelle Soltani Simmons, Esq., served 1/26/2021. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons, #1 Complaint, and #2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement signed by A. P. (name illegible) for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP c/o CT Corporation System served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (dmn, ) Modified on 1/29/2021 to include c/o text. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores East, LP; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint & #2 Conflict Disclosure Statement. (amf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff Bridgett M. Johnson. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bridgett M. Johnson. (dmn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bridgett M. Johnson. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #1 for pdf) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602060950.), filed by Bridgett M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt)(dmn, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Scott Harbuck