This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:23:52 (UTC).

Johnson v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01669

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Johnson

Michael Emery

Defendants

Toyota Motor Corporation

Toyota Motor North America, Inc.

Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas E. Phillips

Attorney at Phillips, Mille & Costabile

7530 Lucerne Drive

Middleburg Heights, OH 44130

David T. Bright

Attorney at Sico, Hoelscher, Harris - Corpus Christi

802 N. Carancahua Street

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorney

Timothy R. Bricker

Attorney at Carpenter, Lipps & Leland - Columbus

280 North High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hino Motors, Ltd., Other Affiliate Misawa Homes Co., Ltd. for Toyota Motor Corporation filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#10

(#10) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #2

Summons Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A.

1 #3

Summons Toyota Motor North America

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9430170. Filed by Donald Johnson, Michael Emery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing Summons, #3 Summons Toyota Motor North America, #4 Summons Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A.) (Phillips, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#9

(#9) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#7

(#7) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 11, 2019 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time

#6

(#6) Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' responsive pleadings due 9/11/19. Judge John R. Adams on 8/26/19.(L,J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#4

(#4) Motion with Certificate of Good Standing for attorney David T. Bright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9481400, filed by Michael Emery, Donald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Phillips, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation for Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Hino Motors, Ltd., Other Affiliate Misawa Homes Co., Ltd. for Toyota Motor Corporation filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Marginal Entry Order granting #5 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants' responsive pleadings due 9/11/19. Judge John R. Adams on 8/26/19.(L,J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 11, 2019 to answer Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Bricker, Timothy) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David T. Bright for Michael Emery and Donald Johnson. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge John R. Adams on 8/22/19.(K,C) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion with Certificate of Good Standing for attorney David T. Bright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9481400, filed by Michael Emery, Donald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Phillips, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. on 8/8/2019; Toyota Motor North America, Inc. on 8/5/2019; and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. on 8/5/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #2 . (O,K) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0062), Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0093); Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. (Receipt # 7017 2620 0000 1626 0147), placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (O,K) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9430170. Filed by Donald Johnson, Michael Emery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing Summons, #3 Summons Toyota Motor North America, #4 Summons Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A.) (Phillips, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.