This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 07:52:39 (UTC).

Johnson v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Johnson filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes and Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-22270

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teresa Johnson

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cesar Gavidia, Jr.

Attorney at Dell & Schaefer

2404 Hollywood Boulevard

Hollywood, FL 33020

Gregory Michael Dell

Attorney at Dell & Schaefer

2404 Hollywood Boulevard

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorney

Philip J. Kantor

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

One East Broward Blvd, Suite 1200

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 6/4/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 07/18/2019)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11696959, filed by Teresa Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit LTD Policy)(Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#10

(#10) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge For Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit LTD Policy

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Teresa Johnson. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (pcs) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Teresa Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ( Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 6/4/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge For Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Teresa Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Teresa Johnson (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Teresa Johnson. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (pcs) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11696959, filed by Teresa Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit LTD Policy)(Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.